EP3742020 - SEALED CHAIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.06.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.10.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.07.2022 [2022/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Daido Kogyo Co., Ltd. I-197,Kumasaka-cho Kaga-shi, Ishikawa 922-8686 / JP | [2020/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAGAE, Masahiro c/o DAIDO KOGYO CO., LTD., I-197, Kumasaka-cho Kaga-shi, Ishikawa 922-8686 / JP | 02 /
HAYASHI, Kohei c/o DAIDO KOGYO CO., LTD., I-197, Kumasaka-cho Kaga-shi, Ishikawa 922-8686 / JP | [2020/48] | Representative(s) | Oxley, Robin John George Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [2020/48] | Application number, filing date | 18900442.7 | 15.01.2018 | [2020/48] | WO2018JP00882 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019138585 | Date: | 18.07.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3742020 | Date: | 25.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.07.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F16G13/06, F16G13/18 | [2021/31] | CPC: |
F16G13/18 (EP);
F16G13/06 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2020/48] | F16G13/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/48] | Title | German: | ABGEDICHTETE KETTE | [2020/48] | English: | SEALED CHAIN | [2020/48] | French: | CHAÎNE SCELLÉE | [2020/48] | Entry into regional phase | 04.08.2020 | Translation filed | 04.08.2020 | National basic fee paid | 04.08.2020 | Search fee paid | 04.08.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.08.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.08.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.08.2020 | Examination requested [2020/48] | 02.02.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/28] | 22.02.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2022 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JPS541765U (-) [X] 1,3,4 * the whole document * [I] 2; | [I]JPS48109349U (-) [I] 1-4 * abstract *; | [A]EP1734282 (DAIDO KOGYO KK [JP]) [A] 1 * abstract * | International search | [Y]JPS5530385 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [Y] 1-4 * , *; | [Y]JP2008281058 (TSUBAKIMOTO CHAIN CO, et al) [Y] 1-4 * , *; | [Y]JP2009036274 (TSUBAKIMOTO CHAIN CO) [Y] 1-4 * , *; | [Y]JPS48109349U [Y] 1-4 * , *; | [Y]JPH1161264 (KOMATSU MFG CO LTD) [Y] 2 * , * |