EP3698095 - BLOWBACK TYPE FIREARM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/35] | BOLT ASSEMBLY FOR BLOWBACK TYPE FIREARMS | ||
[2023/13] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.07.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STURM, RUGER & COMPANY, INC. One Lacey Place Southport, CT 06890 / US | [2023/33] |
Former [2020/35] | For all designated states STURM, RUGER & COMPANY, INC. One Lacey Place Southport, CT 06890 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WILKINSON, Todd 594 Cross Road Goshen, New Hampshire 03752 / US | 02 /
SAUNDERS, Frank J. 90 Fox Hollow Drive Weare, New Hampshire 03281 / US | [2020/35] | Representative(s) | Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [2020/35] | Application number, filing date | 18900518.4 | 16.10.2018 | [2020/35] | WO2018US56047 | Priority number, date | US201762574811P | 20.10.2017 Original published format: US 201762574811 P | [2020/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2019139657 | Date: | 18.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/29] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3698095 | Date: | 26.08.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.07.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3698095 | Date: | 16.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.09.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F41A3/56, F41A5/12, F41A3/02, F41A3/64, F41A3/12, F41C7/00 | [2020/35] | CPC: |
F41A5/12 (EP,US);
F41A3/56 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FEUERWAFFE MIT MASSEVERSCHLUSS | [2023/13] | English: | BLOWBACK TYPE FIREARM | [2023/13] | French: | ARME A FEU AVEC MÉCANISME INERTIEL | [2023/13] |
Former [2020/35] | BOLZENANORDNUNG FÜR RÜCKDRUCKFEUERWAFFEN | ||
Former [2020/35] | BOLT ASSEMBLY FOR BLOWBACK TYPE FIREARMS | ||
Former [2020/35] | ENSEMBLE CULASSE POUR ARMES À FEU DU TYPE « BLOWBACK » | Entry into regional phase | 23.04.2020 | National basic fee paid | 23.04.2020 | Search fee paid | 23.04.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.04.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/35] | 10.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 10.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 17.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 16.08.2023 | DK | 16.08.2023 | EE | 16.08.2023 | ES | 16.08.2023 | FI | 16.08.2023 | HR | 16.08.2023 | LT | 16.08.2023 | LV | 16.08.2023 | MC | 16.08.2023 | NL | 16.08.2023 | PL | 16.08.2023 | RO | 16.08.2023 | RS | 16.08.2023 | SE | 16.08.2023 | SI | 16.08.2023 | SK | 16.08.2023 | SM | 16.08.2023 | FR | 16.10.2023 | LU | 16.10.2023 | NO | 16.11.2023 | GR | 17.11.2023 | IS | 16.12.2023 | PT | 18.12.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/34] | CZ | 16.08.2023 | |
DK | 16.08.2023 | ||
EE | 16.08.2023 | ||
ES | 16.08.2023 | ||
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
MC | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RO | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SK | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
FR | 16.10.2023 | ||
LU | 16.10.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/30] | CZ | 16.08.2023 | |
DK | 16.08.2023 | ||
EE | 16.08.2023 | ||
ES | 16.08.2023 | ||
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
MC | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RO | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SK | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
LU | 16.10.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/28] | CZ | 16.08.2023 | |
DK | 16.08.2023 | ||
EE | 16.08.2023 | ||
ES | 16.08.2023 | ||
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
MC | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RO | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SK | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | CZ | 16.08.2023 | |
DK | 16.08.2023 | ||
EE | 16.08.2023 | ||
ES | 16.08.2023 | ||
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RO | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SK | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | CZ | 16.08.2023 | |
DK | 16.08.2023 | ||
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RO | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 16.08.2023 | |
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 16.08.2023 | |
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 16.08.2023 | |
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 16.08.2023 | |
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE1050240 (DIPAG LTD) [X] 1,5,12,13 * column 1, line 49 - column 3, line 44; figures 1-3 * [A] 2-4,6-11,14-16; | [XA]CA2653036 (CZECH WEAPONS S R O [CZ]) [X] 1,5 * page 6, line 2 - page 8, line 24; figures 1,2 *[A] 2-4,6-16 | International search | [A]US4098016 (FOOTE JOHN P) [A] 1-4, 6-11, 17-28 * , entire document *; | [A]US4169329 (ATCHISSON MAXWELL G [US]) [A] 1-4, 6-11, 17-28 * , entire document *; | [A]US6931978 (DIONNE SYLVAIN [CA]) [A] 6-8, 19-20, 24-28 * , entire document, especially Fig. 1, 8A; col 1, In 6-15; col 8, In 13-29; *; | [A]US7237469 (MURELLO JOHANNES [DE]) [A] 6-8, 19-20, 24-28 * , entire document, especially Fig. 1, 2; col 4, In 49-54; col 4, In 65-67; col 8, In 7-22; *; | [A]US2012144713 (DUBOIS JASON R [US]) [A] 22 * , entire document, especially Fig. 1, 3, 5; para[0025]; para[0026]; para[0027]; *; | [A]US2012204713 (PATEL SWETAL K [US]) [A] 1-4, 6-11, 17-28 * , entire document *; | [A]US8800424 (GANGL JOHN P [US], et al) [A] 1-4, 6-11, 17-28 * , entire document *; | [XA]US2016187082 (PIZANO JORGE [US]) [X] 1-4, 9-11, 17-18, 21, 23 * , entire document, especially Fig. 1, 12C, 12D, 12E, 12F, 14, 18, 20; para[0021]; para[0189]; para[0130]; para[0063]; para[0192]; para[0204]; para[0173]; para[0178]; para[0203]; * [A] 6-8, 19-20, 22, 24-28; | [A]US9395148 (HUANG GEORGE [US]) [A] 1-4, 6-11, 17-28 * , entire document *; | [A]US2016245608 (HAYES STEVE [US], et al) [A] 1-4, 6-11, 17-28 * , entire document *; | [A]US2017045317 (SULLIVAN LEROY JAMES [US], et al) [A] 1-4, 6-11, 17-28 * , entire document *; | [A]US2017160027 (GANGL JOHN PAUL [US]) [A] 1-4, 6-11, 17-28 * , entire document *; | [XT]US2019120579 (WILKINSON TODD [US], et al) [XT] 1-4, 6-11, 17-28* , entire document * | by applicant | DE1050240 |