EP3740596 - ALLOYS AND METHODS TO DEVELOP YIELD STRENGTH DISTRIBUTIONS DURING FORMATION OF METAL PARTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.08.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.10.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states United States Steel Corporation 600 Grant Street Pittsburgh, PA 15219 / US | [2022/19] |
Former [2020/48] | For all designated states The Nanosteel Company, Inc. 272 West Exchange Street, Suite 300 Providence, RI 02903 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRANAGAN, Daniel James 6845 East Sunnyside Idaho Falls, Idaho 83406 / US | 02 /
PARSONS, Craig 3429 Park Meadow Drive Lake Orion, Michigan 48362 / US | 03 /
MACHROWICZ, Tad 955 Rolling Pines Drive Ortonville, Michigan 48462 / US | 04 /
CISCHKE, Jonathan 3941 Shallow Brook Drive Bloomfield Hills, Michigan 48302 / US | 05 /
FRERICHS, Andrew E. 1415 Whitewater Drive Apt. 2305 Idaho Falls, Idaho 83402 / US | 06 /
MEACHAM, Brian E. 3035 Sandstone Drive Idaho Falls, Idaho 83402 / US | 07 /
JUSTICE, Grant G. 1415 Whitewater Drive, Apt. 1312 Idaho Falls, Idaho 83402 / US | 08 /
CLARK, Kurtis 1848 Brookview Drive Idaho Falls, Idaho 03404 / US | 09 /
TEW, Logan J. 2885 Dorothy Street Idaho Falls, Idaho 83402 / US | 10 /
ANDERSON, Scott T. 2907 Laguna Drive Idaho Falls, ID 83404 / US | 11 /
LARISH, Scott 7175 S. Bowman Lane Idaho Falls, Idaho 83406 / US | 12 /
CHENG, Sheng 777 Hoopes Avenue, Apt. K103 Idaho Falls, Idaho 83401 / US | 13 /
GIDDENS, Taylor, L. 22 Vineyard Way White, Georgia 30184 / US | 14 /
SERGUEEVA, Alla 3810 Nathan Drive Idaho Falls, Idaho 83404 / US | [2020/48] | Representative(s) | Richly & Ritschel Patentanwälte PartG mbB Sattlerweg 20 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [2020/48] | Application number, filing date | 18900995.4 | 21.12.2018 | [2020/48] | WO2018US67119 | Priority number, date | US201862618356P | 17.01.2018 Original published format: US 201862618356 P | [2020/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019143443 | Date: | 25.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3740596 | Date: | 25.11.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.07.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 25.07.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C21D7/13, C21D8/00, C21D8/12, C22C38/00 | [2020/48] | CPC: |
C22C38/02 (EP,US);
B21D22/02 (US);
C21D8/0436 (EP,US);
C22C38/04 (EP,US);
C22C38/06 (EP,US);
C22C38/34 (EP,US);
C22C38/42 (EP,US);
C22C38/58 (EP,US);
B21D22/00 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/48] | Title | German: | LEGIERUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR ENTWICKLUNG VON STRECKGRENZENVERTEILUNGEN WÄHREND DER HERSTELLUNG VON METALLTEILEN | [2020/48] | English: | ALLOYS AND METHODS TO DEVELOP YIELD STRENGTH DISTRIBUTIONS DURING FORMATION OF METAL PARTS | [2020/48] | French: | ALLIAGES ET PROCÉDÉS DE DÉVELOPPEMENT DE DISTRIBUTIONS DE LIMITE D'ÉLASTICITÉ AU COURS DE LA FORMATION DE PIÈCES MÉTALLIQUES | [2020/48] | Entry into regional phase | 08.07.2020 | National basic fee paid | 08.07.2020 | Search fee paid | 08.07.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.07.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/48] | 17.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.08.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.01.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/20] | 17.01.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2024/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2023 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2015126424 (NANOSTEEL CO INC [US]) [A] 1-18 * abstract *; | [A]EP3052671 (NANOSTEEL CO INC [US]) [A] 1-18 * abstract *; | [Y]EP3063305 (NANOSTEEL CO INC [US]) [Y] 1-18 * abstract * * claim 1 *; | [A]US2017166988 (BRANAGAN DANIEL JAMES [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * abstract *; | [A]WO2017117128 (NANOSTEEL CO INC [US]) [A] 1-18 * abstract *; | [Y] - KAMIURA TOMOHIRO ET AL, "Study on effect of strain rate on elongation in advanced high strength steel", PROCEDIA ENGINEERING, (20170608), vol. 207, doi:10.1016/J.PROENG.2017.10.1097, ISSN 1877-7058, pages 1988 - 1993, XP085261675 [Y] 1-18 * abstract * * paragraph [03.1] * * figures 5-7 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.proeng.2017.10.1097 | [A] - Der, "Strain rate sensitivity of automotive sheet steels: influence of plastic strain, strain rate, temperature, microstructure, bake hardening and pre-strain", (20100131), pages 1 - 2811, URL: http://publications.rwth-aachen.de/record/94600/files/3271.pdf, (20210608), XP055811865 [A] 1-18 * the whole document * | [A] - LIM SUNG JUN ET AL, "Fracture loci of DP980 steel sheet for auto-body at intermediate strain rates", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF AUTOMOTIVE TECHNOLOGY, THE KOREAN SOCIETY OF AUTOMOTIVE ENGINEERS, HEIDELBERG, vol. 18, no. 4, doi:10.1007/S12239-017-0071-Z, ISSN 1229-9138, (20170524), pages 719 - 727, (20170524), XP036243666 [A] 1-18 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s12239-017-0071-z | International search | [A]US8257512 (BRANAGAN DANIEL JAMES [US], et al) [A] 1-9, 10a, 10b, 11-17 * entire document *; | [A]US8419869 (BRANAGAN DANIEL JAMES [US], et al) [A] 1-9, 10a, 10b, 11-17 * entire document *; | [A]US2016145725 (BRANAGAN DANIEL JAMES [US], et al) [A] 1-9, 10a, 10b, 11-17 * entire document *; | [A]US2016319387 (KIM DONG-KYUN [KR], et al) [A] 1-9, 10a, 10b, 11-17* entire document *; | [A]WO2018009750 (NANOSTEEL CO INC [US]) [A] 1-9, 10a, 10b, 11-17 * entire document * |