EP3740340 - METHOD FOR CURING SOLDER PASTE ON A THERMALLY FRAGILE SUBSTRATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.10.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NCC Nano, LLC Three Forest Plaza Suite 930 12221 Merit Drive Dallas, TX 75251 / US | [2020/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HENDRIKS, Rob, Jacob Holstraat 49 5654BN Eindhoven / NL | [2020/48] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/48] | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | Application number, filing date | 18901662.9 | 19.01.2018 | [2020/48] | WO2018US14501 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019143358 | Date: | 25.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3740340 | Date: | 25.11.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.07.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 25.07.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/60, H01L23/498, H01L23/14, H05K3/34, H05K3/32, B23K1/005 | [2021/36] | CPC: |
B23K1/0016 (EP,KR);
B23K35/025 (EP,KR);
B23K1/005 (EP,KR);
B23K1/19 (EP,KR);
B23K35/36 (EP,KR);
H01L23/145 (EP);
H01L23/49816 (EP);
H01L24/13 (EP);
H01L24/81 (EP);
H05K3/321 (EP);
H05K3/3494 (EP,KR);
B23K2101/42 (EP,KR);
B23K2103/40 (EP,KR);
B23K2103/42 (EP,KR);
B23K2103/54 (EP,KR);
B23K35/262 (EP);
H01L2224/131 (EP);
H01L2224/13111 (EP);
H01L2224/1329 (EP);
H01L2224/133 (EP);
H01L2224/16227 (EP);
H01L2224/7526 (EP);
H01L2224/75262 (EP);
H01L2224/75263 (EP);
H01L2224/81192 (EP);
H01L2224/8123 (EP);
H01L2224/81234 (EP);
H01L2224/81815 (EP);
H01L24/16 (EP);
H01L2924/1579 (EP);
H01L2924/351 (EP);
H01L2924/3511 (EP);
H01L2924/3512 (EP);
H05K1/0274 (EP);
H05K2201/0108 (EP,KR);
H05K2201/0112 (EP,KR);
H05K2201/2054 (EP,KR)
(-)
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/13111, H01L2924/01029, H01L2924/01047, H01L2924/00012 (EP);
H01L2224/131, H01L2924/014 (EP);
H01L2224/1329, H01L2924/0665 (EP);
H01L2224/133, H01L2924/00014 (EP) |
Former IPC [2020/48] | B23K35/02, B23K35/26, B23K35/36 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/48] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM AUSHÄRTEN EINER LÖTPASTE AUF EINEM THERMISCH ZERBRECHLICHEN SUBSTRAT | [2020/48] | English: | METHOD FOR CURING SOLDER PASTE ON A THERMALLY FRAGILE SUBSTRATE | [2020/48] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE DURCISSEMENT DE PÂTE À SOUDER SUR UN SUBSTRAT THERMIQUEMENT FRAGILE | [2020/48] | Entry into regional phase | 17.07.2020 | National basic fee paid | 17.07.2020 | Search fee paid | 17.07.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.07.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/48] | 10.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2023 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   21.03.2023 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH05109824 (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO) [Y] 1-4,6 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0018] * * figures 1, 2, 6 *; | [Y]EP0758145 (TAIYO YUDEN KK [JP]) [Y] 1-4,6 * column 7, lines 1-30 * * column 8, lines 38-54 * * column 10, line 19 - column 11, line 15 * * figures 7, 11, 16 *; | [Y]US2011300676 (SCHRODER KURT A [US], et al) [Y] 4 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0033] * * figure 1 *; | [Y]US2015221602 (ALIANE ABDELKADER [FR], et al) [Y] 4 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0052] ** figure 14 *; | [Y] - VAN DEN ENDE D A ET AL, "Photonic Flash Soldering of Thin Chips and SMD Components on Foils for Flexible Electronics", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMPONENTS, PACKAGING AND MANUFACTURING TECHNOLOGY, IEEE, USA, vol. 4, no. 11, doi:10.1109/TCPMT.2014.2360410, ISSN 2156-3950, (20141013), pages 1879 - 1886, (20141031), XP011563124 [Y] 1-4,6 * sections I-II; figures 1(a),(c) * * section IV, subsection A, second paragraph * * section IV, subsection B, third paragraph * * section V * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TCPMT.2014.2360410 | International search | [A]US3509317 (VALSAMAKIS CHRISTOPHER, et al) [A] 1-21* Entire document *; | [A]US5088189 (BROWN JOHN E [US]) [A] 1-21 * Abstract, Col 1 lines 8-10, 16-17, 32-34; Col 2 lines 12-14; Col 4 lines 6-11, 13-15; Col 7 lines 1-3; *; | [A]US6388187 (TAKEYAMA YOSHIFUMI [JP], et al) [A] 1-21 * Col 2 lines 49-52; Col 4 lines 1-6; Col 10 lines 43-46; Col 12 lines 31-35; Col 13 lines 11-13; Col 17 lines 8-11; Col 20 lines 24-26 *; | [A]US2014369038 (TISCHLER MICHAEL A [CA], et al) [A] 1-21 * Entire document *; | [A]US2015176133 (POPE DAVE S [US], et al) [A] 1-21 * para[0004], [0006], [0017], [0019], [0031], [0033]; Figure 2 *; | [A]US2017027063 (SCHRODER KURT A [US], et al) [A] 1-21 * Entire document * |