14.06.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] |
24.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] |
19.01.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.02.2024 [2024/08] |
17.11.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.12.2023 [2023/51] |
03.11.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.12.2023 [2023/49] |
20.10.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.11.2023 [2023/47] |
22.09.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.10.2023 [2023/43] |
18.08.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.09.2023 [2023/38] |
11.08.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.09.2023 [2023/37] |
11.08.2023 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 13.09.2023 [2023/37] |
28.07.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.08.2023 [2023/35] |
21.07.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.08.2023 [2023/34] |
14.07.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.08.2023 [2023/33] |
02.06.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.07.2023 [2023/27] |
26.05.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.06.2023 [2023/26] |
19.05.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.06.2023 [2023/25] |
05.05.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.06.2023 [2023/23] |
28.04.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.05.2023 [2023/22] |
14.04.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.05.2023 [2023/20] |
24.03.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.04.2023 [2023/17] |
02.09.2022 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 05.10.2022 [2022/40] |
26.08.2022 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
26.08.2022 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
24.08.2022 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
09.05.2022 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
25.01.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.09.2021 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 20.10.2021 [2021/42] |
17.09.2021 |
Change - classification |
published on 20.10.2021 [2021/42] |
03.04.2021 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 05.05.2021 [2021/18] |
03.04.2021 |
Change - extension states |
published on 05.05.2021 [2021/18] |
29.01.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.10.2020 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 02.12.2020 [2020/49] |
30.10.2020 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 02.12.2020 [2020/49] |
06.10.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.09.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.09.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.08.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.08.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.08.2020 |
Change - representative |
|
25.08.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.08.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.08.2019 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|