EP3745232 - AUTOMATIC TRAVEL SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 04.11.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.07.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.10.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.11.2022 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.12.2022 [2022/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yanmar Power Technology Co., Ltd. 1-32, Chayamachi Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-0013 / JP | [2020/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AOKI, Hideaki c/o YANMAR CO., LTD. 1-32, Chayamachi Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-0013 / JP | 02 /
SUZUKI, Akihiro c/o YANMAR CO., LTD. 1-32, Chayamachi Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-0013 / JP | [2020/49] | Representative(s) | Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. Postfach 70 04 25 81304 München / DE | [2020/49] | Application number, filing date | 18902412.8 | 31.10.2018 | [2020/49] | WO2018JP40542 | Priority number, date | JP20180011542 | 26.01.2018 Original published format: JP 2018011542 | [2020/49] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019146202 | Date: | 01.08.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3745232 | Date: | 02.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.08.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G05D1/02, A01B69/00, G01S5/14 | [2020/49] | CPC: |
G05D1/0261 (EP);
A01B69/00 (EP);
G01S5/14 (EP);
G05D1/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/49] | Title | German: | AUTOMATISCHES FAHRSYSTEM | [2020/49] | English: | AUTOMATIC TRAVEL SYSTEM | [2020/49] | French: | SYSTÈME DE DÉPLACEMENT AUTOMATIQUE | [2020/49] | Entry into regional phase | 24.07.2020 | Translation filed | 24.07.2020 | National basic fee paid | 24.07.2020 | Search fee paid | 24.07.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.07.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/49] | 24.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.07.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.10.2022 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2022/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]CN101957447 (BEIJING INST PETROCHEM TECH) [Y] 2,3 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [00 3]; figure 1 *[A] 1; | [XYI] - BARAI S ET AL, "Path following of autonomous mobile robot using passive RFID tags", 2016 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON MICROELECTRONICS, COMPUTING AND COMMUNICATIONS (MICROCOM), IEEE, (20160123), doi:10.1109/MICROCOM.2016.7522573, pages 1 - 6, XP032931007 [X] 1 * page 3, column 1, paragraph 2, figure 3, page 4, section IV.C, first paragraph, page 3, column 1, section IV.B, first paragraph, page 3, column 2, section IV.A, page 4, section IV.C, Algorithm 1, page 3, column 2, section B, first paragraph, page 3, column 1, section IV.B, first paragraph * [Y] 2,3 [I] 6 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MicroCom.2016.7522573 | International search | [Y]JP2004108782 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [Y] 4 * , *; | [A]JP2008092818 (YANMAR CO LTD) [A] 1-6* , *; | [Y]JP2009259023 (PANASONIC CORP) [Y] 4 * , *; | [Y]CN101957447 (BEIJING INST PETROCHEM TECH) [Y] 1-6 * , *; | [A]JP2011076215 (NEC PERSONAL PRODUCTS CO LTD) [A] 5 * , *; | [A]CN104834313 (UNIV JINAN) [A] 1-6 * , *; | [Y]JP5987187B [Y] 1-6 * , & JP 2017-75927 A & WO 2017/064987 A1 & US 2018/0003812 A1, & EP 3349035 A1 & CN 107003401 A & KR 10-2018-0073514 A *; | [Y]JP2017194764 (FURUYA-SEIZAI CO) [Y] 5-6 * , * | by applicant | JP2008092818 | JP5987187B |