EP3730407 - AIRCRAFT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.12.2021 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.09.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.12.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.01.2022 [2022/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES, LTD. 2-3, Marunouchi 3-Chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8332 / JP | [2020/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YUMITORI, Takaaki c/o MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES, LTD. 16-5, Konan 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8215 / JP | 02 /
NOMURA, Takayuki c/o MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES, LTD. 16-5, Konan 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8215 / JP | 03 /
KODAMA, Satoshi c/o MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES, LTD. 16-5, Konan 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8215 / JP | [2020/44] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [2020/44] | Application number, filing date | 18903289.9 | 07.09.2018 | [2020/44] | WO2018JP33326 | Priority number, date | JP20180015594 | 31.01.2018 Original published format: JP 2018015594 | [2020/44] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019150637 | Date: | 08.08.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3730407 | Date: | 28.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.08.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.01.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B64D27/26, B64C7/00, B64D7/04, B64C3/32, B64D29/02 | [2021/07] | CPC: |
B64C3/32 (EP);
B64D27/40 (EP,US);
B64C7/00 (EP,US);
B64D27/18 (US);
B64D29/02 (EP);
B64D7/04 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2020/44] | B64D27/26, B64C7/00, B64D7/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/44] | Title | German: | LUFTFAHRZEUG | [2020/44] | English: | AIRCRAFT | [2020/44] | French: | AÉRONEF | [2020/44] | Entry into regional phase | 22.07.2020 | Translation filed | 22.07.2020 | National basic fee paid | 22.07.2020 | Search fee paid | 22.07.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.07.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/44] | 17.08.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/04] | 07.09.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2021 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]GB349895 (HUGO JUNKERS); | [XI]US4235400 (HAWORTH FLOY [US]); | [A]WO2008007135 (AIRBUS UK LTD [GB], et al); | [XI]US2013020433 (HOISINGTON ZACHARY C [US]); | [A]US9868540 (BARMICHEV SERGEY D [US], et al) | International search | [Y]JP2009509847 ; | [Y]JP2009542524 ; | [Y]US8191823 (GUERING BERNARD [FR], et al); | [XY]US2013020433 (HOISINGTON ZACHARY C [US]) | by applicant | US9211955 |