EP3706296 - METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING ARMATURE, AND DEVICE FOR MANUFACTURING ARMATURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.07.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.03.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.01.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.08.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AISIN CORPORATION 1, Asahi-machi 2-chome Kariya-shi Aichi 448-8650 / JP | [2022/08] |
Former [2020/37] | For all designated states AISIN AW CO., LTD. 10, Takane, Fujii-cho Anjo-shi, Aichi, 444-1192 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOGA, Kiyotaka c/o AISIN AW CO., LTD., 10, Takane, Fujii-cho Anjo-shi, Aichi 444-1192 / JP | 02 /
SUGIHARA, Tomotsugu c/o AISIN AW CO., LTD., 10, Takane, Fujii-cho Anjo-shi, Aichi 444-1192 / JP | [2020/37] | Representative(s) | Kramer Barske Schmidtchen Patentanwälte PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | [2020/37] | Application number, filing date | 18904106.4 | 14.12.2018 | [2020/37] | WO2018JP46096 | Priority number, date | JP20180014276 | 31.01.2018 Original published format: JP 2018014276 | [2020/37] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019150789 | Date: | 08.08.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3706296 | Date: | 09.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3706296 | Date: | 07.08.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.08.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.01.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H02K15/00, H02K15/06, H02K15/085, H02K3/12 | [2021/07] | CPC: |
H02K3/12 (EP,US);
H02K15/0031 (EP,US);
H02K15/0037 (US);
H02K15/0081 (EP);
H02K15/064 (EP,US);
H02K15/085 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49009 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/37] | H02K15/085, H02K3/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/37] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES ANKERS UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES ANKERS | [2020/37] | English: | METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING ARMATURE, AND DEVICE FOR MANUFACTURING ARMATURE | [2020/37] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE FABRICATION D'UN INDUIT | [2020/37] | Entry into regional phase | 03.06.2020 | Translation filed | 03.06.2020 | National basic fee paid | 03.06.2020 | Search fee paid | 03.06.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.06.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/37] | 29.01.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.05.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.07.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 02.07.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.07.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2016172919 (HATTORI HIROYUKI [JP]); | [X]US2017040859 (LANGLARD NICOLAS [FR]); | [X]US2017133893 (BILTERYST PIERRE-YVES [FR], et al); | [E]EP3706295 (AISIN AW CO [JP]) | International search | [A]JPS58112446 (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO); | [A]JPH10117455 (DENSO CORP); | [A]JP2006158044 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [A]JP2009194999 (DENSO CORP); | [Y]JP2011120356 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [Y]JP2011205834 (AISIN AW CO); | [Y]JP2014217228 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD); | [Y]JP2015023771 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [Y]US2017040859 (LANGLARD NICOLAS [FR]) | by applicant | JP2015023771 |