EP3633259 - PIPE FITTING JOINT ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.12.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.01.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.09.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.03.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rifeng Enterprise (Foshan) Co., Ltd. F1-F14, No.1 Rifeng Road Leping Sanshui Foshan, Guangdong 528100 / CN | For all designated states Rifeng Enterprise Group Co., Ltd. 8/f Rifeng Building No.16 Zumiao Road Foshan, Guangdong 528000 / CN | For all designated states Rifeng Technology Co., Ltd. Building 2 No. 19 D Zone Sanshui Industrial Park Foshan, Guangdong 528000 / CN | [2020/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIN, Xiyong F1-F14, No.1 Rifeng Road, Leping, Sanshui Foshan, Guangdong 528100 / CN | 02 /
CHENG, Jiajia F1-F14, No.1 Rifeng Road, Leping, Sanshui Foshan, Guangdong 528100 / CN | 03 /
DIAO, Zhenbin F1-F14, No.1 Rifeng Road, Leping, Sanshui Foshan, Guangdong 528100 / CN | 04 /
LI, Xin F1-F14, No.1 Rifeng Road, Leping, Sanshui Foshan, Guangdong 528100 / CN | 05 /
CAO, Huijian F1-F14, No.1 Rifeng Road, Leping, Sanshui Foshan, Guangdong 528100 / CN | 06 /
CHEN, Wenfeng F1-F14, No.1 Rifeng Road, Leping, Sanshui Foshan, Guangdong 528100 / CN | 07 /
LIAO, Jianbo F1-F14, No.1 Rifeng Road, Leping, Sanshui Foshan, Guangdong 528100 / CN | 08 /
LI, Ximin F1-F14, No.1 Rifeng Road, Leping, Sanshui Foshan, Guangdong 528100 / CN | 09 /
CHEN, Ali F1-F14, No.1 Rifeng Road, Leping, Sanshui Foshan, Guangdong 528100 / CN | [2020/15] | Representative(s) | Petraz, Gilberto Luigi, et al GLP S.r.l. Viale Europa Unita, 171 33100 Udine / IT | [2020/15] | Application number, filing date | 18904457.1 | 29.12.2018 | [2020/15] | WO2018CN125613 | Priority number, date | CN201810102123 | 01.02.2018 Original published format: CN201810102123 | CN201821172431U | 23.07.2018 Original published format: CN 201821172431 U | [2020/15] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019149014 | Date: | 08.08.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3633259 | Date: | 08.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3633259 | Date: | 08.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 08.08.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F16L37/12, F16L37/091 | [2020/42] | CPC: |
F16L37/091 (EP,US);
F16L37/0915 (EP);
F16L37/12 (EP);
F16L2201/10 (US)
|
Former IPC [2020/15] | F16L37/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ROHRANSCHLUSSVERBINDUNGSANORDNUNG | [2020/15] | English: | PIPE FITTING JOINT ASSEMBLY | [2020/15] | French: | ENSEMBLE JOINT DE RACCORD DE TUYAU | [2020/15] | Entry into regional phase | 02.01.2020 | Translation filed | 02.01.2020 | National basic fee paid | 02.01.2020 | Search fee paid | 02.01.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.01.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/15] | 29.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.09.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.11.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 30.11.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.11.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 09.11.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.02.2023 | CZ | 08.02.2023 | DK | 08.02.2023 | EE | 08.02.2023 | ES | 08.02.2023 | FI | 08.02.2023 | HR | 08.02.2023 | IT | 08.02.2023 | LT | 08.02.2023 | LV | 08.02.2023 | MC | 08.02.2023 | NL | 08.02.2023 | PL | 08.02.2023 | RO | 08.02.2023 | RS | 08.02.2023 | SI | 08.02.2023 | SK | 08.02.2023 | SM | 08.02.2023 | NO | 08.05.2023 | GR | 09.05.2023 | IS | 08.06.2023 | PT | 09.06.2023 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/26] | AT | 08.02.2023 | |
CZ | 08.02.2023 | ||
DK | 08.02.2023 | ||
EE | 08.02.2023 | ||
ES | 08.02.2023 | ||
FI | 08.02.2023 | ||
HR | 08.02.2023 | ||
IT | 08.02.2023 | ||
LT | 08.02.2023 | ||
LV | 08.02.2023 | ||
NL | 08.02.2023 | ||
PL | 08.02.2023 | ||
RO | 08.02.2023 | ||
RS | 08.02.2023 | ||
SI | 08.02.2023 | ||
SK | 08.02.2023 | ||
SM | 08.02.2023 | ||
NO | 08.05.2023 | ||
GR | 09.05.2023 | ||
IS | 08.06.2023 | ||
PT | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/11] | AT | 08.02.2023 | |
CZ | 08.02.2023 | ||
DK | 08.02.2023 | ||
EE | 08.02.2023 | ||
ES | 08.02.2023 | ||
FI | 08.02.2023 | ||
HR | 08.02.2023 | ||
LT | 08.02.2023 | ||
LV | 08.02.2023 | ||
NL | 08.02.2023 | ||
PL | 08.02.2023 | ||
RO | 08.02.2023 | ||
RS | 08.02.2023 | ||
SI | 08.02.2023 | ||
SK | 08.02.2023 | ||
SM | 08.02.2023 | ||
NO | 08.05.2023 | ||
GR | 09.05.2023 | ||
IS | 08.06.2023 | ||
PT | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 08.02.2023 | |
CZ | 08.02.2023 | ||
DK | 08.02.2023 | ||
EE | 08.02.2023 | ||
ES | 08.02.2023 | ||
FI | 08.02.2023 | ||
HR | 08.02.2023 | ||
LT | 08.02.2023 | ||
LV | 08.02.2023 | ||
NL | 08.02.2023 | ||
PL | 08.02.2023 | ||
RO | 08.02.2023 | ||
RS | 08.02.2023 | ||
SK | 08.02.2023 | ||
SM | 08.02.2023 | ||
NO | 08.05.2023 | ||
GR | 09.05.2023 | ||
IS | 08.06.2023 | ||
PT | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 08.02.2023 | |
CZ | 08.02.2023 | ||
DK | 08.02.2023 | ||
EE | 08.02.2023 | ||
ES | 08.02.2023 | ||
FI | 08.02.2023 | ||
HR | 08.02.2023 | ||
LT | 08.02.2023 | ||
LV | 08.02.2023 | ||
NL | 08.02.2023 | ||
PL | 08.02.2023 | ||
RO | 08.02.2023 | ||
RS | 08.02.2023 | ||
SM | 08.02.2023 | ||
NO | 08.05.2023 | ||
GR | 09.05.2023 | ||
IS | 08.06.2023 | ||
PT | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 08.02.2023 | |
DK | 08.02.2023 | ||
EE | 08.02.2023 | ||
ES | 08.02.2023 | ||
FI | 08.02.2023 | ||
HR | 08.02.2023 | ||
LT | 08.02.2023 | ||
LV | 08.02.2023 | ||
NL | 08.02.2023 | ||
PL | 08.02.2023 | ||
RS | 08.02.2023 | ||
SM | 08.02.2023 | ||
NO | 08.05.2023 | ||
GR | 09.05.2023 | ||
IS | 08.06.2023 | ||
PT | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | AT | 08.02.2023 | |
DK | 08.02.2023 | ||
ES | 08.02.2023 | ||
FI | 08.02.2023 | ||
HR | 08.02.2023 | ||
LT | 08.02.2023 | ||
LV | 08.02.2023 | ||
NL | 08.02.2023 | ||
PL | 08.02.2023 | ||
RS | 08.02.2023 | ||
SM | 08.02.2023 | ||
NO | 08.05.2023 | ||
GR | 09.05.2023 | ||
IS | 08.06.2023 | ||
PT | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | AT | 08.02.2023 | |
ES | 08.02.2023 | ||
FI | 08.02.2023 | ||
HR | 08.02.2023 | ||
LT | 08.02.2023 | ||
LV | 08.02.2023 | ||
NL | 08.02.2023 | ||
PL | 08.02.2023 | ||
RS | 08.02.2023 | ||
NO | 08.05.2023 | ||
GR | 09.05.2023 | ||
IS | 08.06.2023 | ||
PT | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AT | 08.02.2023 | |
ES | 08.02.2023 | ||
FI | 08.02.2023 | ||
HR | 08.02.2023 | ||
LT | 08.02.2023 | ||
LV | 08.02.2023 | ||
NL | 08.02.2023 | ||
PL | 08.02.2023 | ||
RS | 08.02.2023 | ||
NO | 08.05.2023 | ||
GR | 09.05.2023 | ||
PT | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AT | 08.02.2023 | |
ES | 08.02.2023 | ||
FI | 08.02.2023 | ||
HR | 08.02.2023 | ||
LT | 08.02.2023 | ||
LV | 08.02.2023 | ||
NL | 08.02.2023 | ||
RS | 08.02.2023 | ||
NO | 08.05.2023 | ||
GR | 09.05.2023 | ||
PT | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | AT | 08.02.2023 | |
ES | 08.02.2023 | ||
FI | 08.02.2023 | ||
HR | 08.02.2023 | ||
LT | 08.02.2023 | ||
LV | 08.02.2023 | ||
NL | 08.02.2023 | ||
RS | 08.02.2023 | ||
NO | 08.05.2023 | ||
PT | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 08.02.2023 | |
ES | 08.02.2023 | ||
HR | 08.02.2023 | ||
LT | 08.02.2023 | ||
NL | 08.02.2023 | ||
RS | 08.02.2023 | ||
NO | 08.05.2023 | ||
PT | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | ES | 08.02.2023 | |
LT | 08.02.2023 | ||
RS | 08.02.2023 | ||
PT | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | ES | 08.02.2023 | |
LT | 08.02.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]WO2006031386 (SHUR LOK CORP [US], et al) [Y] 1-4,9,10 * paragraph [0051]; figures 1,2 * [A] 5-8; | [YA]WO2006037962 (IMI NORGREN LTD [GB], et al) [Y] 1-4,9,10 * pages 3-5; figures 1,2 * [A] 5-8; | [YA]US2015345683 (CROMPTON DAVID B [US], et al) [Y] 1,9,10 * paragraphs [0018] - [0079]; figure 18 *[A] 5-8 |