EP3636002 - MOBILITY ENHANCEMENTS FOR CELLULAR COMMUNICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.01.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.03.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.03.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 13.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.01.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.02.2022 [2022/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Apple Inc. One Apple Park Way Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | [2020/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LOVLEKAR, Srirang A. One Apple Park Way Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 02 /
XING, Longda One Apple Park Way Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 03 /
NIMMALA, Srinivasan One Apple Park Way Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 04 /
ZHANG, Dawei One Apple Park Way Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 05 /
XU, Fangli Mail Stop 850-8RE 25F International Finance Centre 8 Jianguomenwai Avenue Chaoyang District Beijing 100022 / CN | 06 /
HU, Haijing APPLE, 25F International Finance Centre 8 Jianguomenwai Avenue Chaoyang District Beijing 100022 / CN | 07 /
GURUMOORTHY, Sethuraman One Apple Park Way Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 08 /
SHIKARI, Murtaza A. One Apple Park Way Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | [2020/16] | Representative(s) | Lang, Johannes Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [2020/16] | Application number, filing date | 18904494.4 | 28.08.2018 | [2020/16] | WO2018CN102652 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020041966 | Date: | 05.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3636002 | Date: | 15.04.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.03.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 05.03.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04W12/37, H04W12/037, H04W36/00, // H04W80/02 | [2021/11] | CPC: |
H04W12/37 (EP);
H04W36/0038 (KR,US);
H04L63/205 (EP);
H04W12/037 (EP);
H04W12/04 (KR);
H04W36/02 (EP,KR,US);
H04W40/36 (KR);
H04W36/00692 (EP,KR,US);
H04W36/00698 (EP,KR,US);
H04W80/02 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/16] | H04W36/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/45] |
Former [2020/16] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | MOBILITÄTSVERBESSERUNGEN FÜR ZELLULARE KOMMUNIKATIONEN | [2020/16] | English: | MOBILITY ENHANCEMENTS FOR CELLULAR COMMUNICATIONS | [2020/16] | French: | AMÉLIORATIONS DE LA MOBILITÉ POUR DES COMMUNICATIONS CELLULAIRES | [2020/16] | Entry into regional phase | 13.08.2019 | National basic fee paid | 13.08.2019 | Search fee paid | 13.08.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.08.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.08.2019 | Examination requested [2020/16] | 15.09.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/08] | 05.10.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/08] | Divisional application(s) | EP21191857.8 / EP3930290 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2017215225 (YI SEUNGJUNE [KR], et al); |