EP3750991 - RANDOM INTERESTERIFICATION LIPASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.04.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.11.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Amano Enzyme Inc. 2-7, Nishiki 1-chome Naka-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 460-8630 / JP | [2020/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUJIOKA, Hiroki c/o Gifu R&D Center, AMANO ENZYME INC., 1-6 Technoplaza Kakamigahara-shi, Gifu 509-0109 / JP | 02 /
NORIFUNE, Saki c/o Gifu R&D Center, AMANO ENZYME INC., 1-6 Technoplaza Kakamigahara-shi, Gifu 509-0109 / JP | 03 /
HAMADA, Tatsuya c/o Gifu R&D Center, AMANO ENZYME INC., 1-6 Technoplaza Kakamigahara-shi, Gifu 509-0109 / JP | 04 /
TAKAHASHI, Tetsuya c/o Gifu R&D Center, AMANO ENZYME INC., 1-6 Technoplaza Kakamigahara-shi, Gifu 509-0109 / JP | 05 /
TANAKA, Yusuke c/o Gifu R&D Center AMANO ENZYME INC., 1-6 Technoplaza Kakamigahara-shi, Gifu 509-0109 / JP | 06 /
KATASE, Toru c/o Gifu R&D Center, AMANO ENZYME INC., 1-6 Technoplaza Kakamigahara-shi, Gifu 509-0109 / JP | [2020/51] | Representative(s) | Jaekel, Robert Sebastian Witthoff Jaekel Steinecke, Patentanwälte PartG mbB Patent Department P.O. Box 11 40 52412 Jülich / DE | [2020/51] | Application number, filing date | 18904906.7 | 27.12.2018 | [2020/51] | WO2018JP48378 | Priority number, date | JP20180022487 | 09.02.2018 Original published format: JP 2018022487 | [2020/51] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019155790 | Date: | 15.08.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3750991 | Date: | 16.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 15.08.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/20, C12P7/64 | [2020/51] | CPC: |
C12P7/6458 (EP,US);
C12N9/20 (EP,US);
C12P7/64 (US);
C12Y301/01003 (EP,US);
C12R2001/72 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/51] | Title | German: | LIPASE MIT ZUFÄLLIGER UMESTERUNG | [2020/51] | English: | RANDOM INTERESTERIFICATION LIPASE | [2020/51] | French: | LIPASE D'INTERESTÉRIFICATION ALÉATOIRE | [2020/51] | Entry into regional phase | 19.08.2020 | Translation filed | 19.08.2020 | National basic fee paid | 19.08.2020 | Search fee paid | 19.08.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.08.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.08.2020 | Examination requested [2020/51] | 25.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.08.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPH01501120 ; | [Y]JPH0292281 (SHOWA DENKO KK); | [Y]JPH0866186 (D H EE KODO SEISEI CHUSHUTSU G); | [A]JP2005185290 (ACADEMIA SINICA); | by applicant | WO2006059592 | JP3791943B | JP2008194011 | WO2012077614 | JP2018022487 |