EP3752323 - APPARATUSES AND METHODS FOR SEPARATING, FEEDING AND MOUNTING O-RINGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.03.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.02.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.11.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.03.2023 | Withdrawal of application | published on 19.04.2023 [2023/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB Schweiz AG Bruggerstrasse 66 5400 Baden / CH | [2020/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Cheng Room 401, No. 20, Lane 1200, Bei'ai Road, Pudong New District Shanghai 201204 / CN | 02 /
ZHAO, Feifei Room 341, No. 2B Student Apartment Shaanxi University of Science and Technology Xi'an, Shaanxi 710021 / CN | 03 /
MAO, Yichao Room 2-101, No. 399 Zijinghua Road Hangzhou, Zhejiang 310000 / CN | [2020/52] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | [2020/52] | Application number, filing date | 18906518.8 | 13.02.2018 | [2020/52] | WO2018CN76680 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019157640 | Date: | 22.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3752323 | Date: | 23.12.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.08.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 22.08.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B25B27/00, B25B11/00 | [2021/38] | CPC: |
B25B11/007 (EP);
B25B27/0028 (EP,US);
B23P19/084 (US);
B25J15/0019 (US);
B23P19/105 (US);
B25J11/00 (US);
B25J13/086 (US);
B25J15/0023 (US);
B25J15/0616 (US);
B25J15/0658 (US);
B25J15/0683 (US);
Y10T29/49872 (US);
Y10T29/53657 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/52] | B25B27/28 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/52] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUM TRENNEN, ZUFÜHREN UND MONTIEREN VON DICHTUNGSRINGEN | [2020/52] | English: | APPARATUSES AND METHODS FOR SEPARATING, FEEDING AND MOUNTING O-RINGS | [2020/52] | French: | APPAREILS ET PROCÉDÉS POUR SÉPARER, DÉLIVRER ET MONTER DES JOINTS TORIQUES | [2020/52] | Entry into regional phase | 03.08.2020 | National basic fee paid | 03.08.2020 | Search fee paid | 03.08.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.08.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.08.2020 | Examination requested [2020/52] | 21.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 15.03.2023 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2023/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US3694894 (JELINEK JERRY G, et al) [X] 1,11 * column 2, line 33 - column 3, line 37; figures 1-6 * [A] 2 [I] 12,13; | [XAI]JP2012024892 (RICOH CO LTD) [X] 1-3,11 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0090]; figures 1-16 * [A] 9 [I] 4-7,12,13; | [XAI]EP2874218 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [X] 1,8,10,11 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0077]; figures 1-15 * [A] 9[I] 12,13 | International search | [A]US3694894 (JELINEK JERRY G, et al) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9206816 (COMMENT PAUL [CH]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]JPH10146726 (SHINKO ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [X]JP2012024892 (RICOH CO LTD) [X] 1-13 * Pages 4-12 of description, figs. 1-16 *; | [A]US2015224613 (IWASHITA TETSUNORI [JP]) [A] 1-13* the whole document *; | [A]CN206925779U (JIANG YULIANG) [A] 1-13 * the whole document * | by applicant | US3694894 | JP2012024892 | EP2874218 |