EP3702127 - DEVICE FOR AUTOMATICALLY FITTING TUBE TO BENDING MOLD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.01.2024 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.11.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.07.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 31.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LV, PL, PT | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sanoh Industrial Co., Ltd. 1-23-23 Ebisu Shibuya-ku Tokyo 150-0013 / JP | [2020/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Jining c/o SANOH INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 758 Konosu Koga-shi, Ibaraki 306-0041 / JP | 02 /
NAKAZATO, Kazuhiko c/o SANOH INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 758 Konosu Koga-shi, Ibaraki 306-0041 / JP | 03 /
HABU, Takaaki c/o SANOH INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 758 Konosu Koga-shi, Ibaraki 306-0041 / JP | 04 /
HARAGA, Kazuyuki c/o SANOH INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 758 Konosu Koga-shi, Ibaraki 306-0041 / JP | [2021/08] |
Former [2020/36] | 01 /
LIU Jining c/o SANOH INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 758 Konosu Koga-shi, Ibaraki 306-0041 / JP | ||
02 /
NAKAZATO Kazuhiko c/o SANOH INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 758 Konosu Koga-shi, Ibaraki 306-0041 / JP | |||
03 /
HABU Takaaki c/o SANOH INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 758 Konosu Koga-shi, Ibaraki 306-0041 / JP | |||
04 /
HARAGA Kazuyuki c/o SANOH INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 758 Konosu Koga-shi, Ibaraki 306-0041 / JP | Representative(s) | VKK Patentanwälte PartG mbB Edisonstraße 2 87437 Kempten / DE | [2024/08] |
Former [2020/36] | Hoppe, Lars VKK Patentanwälte PartG mbB Edisonstraße 2 87437 Kempten / DE | Application number, filing date | 18906907.3 | 09.10.2018 | [2020/36] | WO2018JP37538 | Priority number, date | JP20180030027 | 22.02.2018 Original published format: JP 2018030027 | [2020/36] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019163187 | Date: | 29.08.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3702127 | Date: | 02.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3702127 | Date: | 21.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.08.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B29C53/08, B21D7/02, B29L23/00, B29C53/80 | [2021/34] | CPC: |
B29C53/083 (EP,US);
B29C53/08 (EP,KR);
B21D7/02 (EP,US);
B29C31/002 (KR);
B29C31/008 (KR);
B29C31/08 (KR);
B29C53/80 (EP,KR);
B29D23/00 (KR);
B29B13/024 (US);
|
Former IPC [2020/36] | B29C53/08, B21D7/02, B29L23/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM AUTOMATISCHEN ANBRINGEN EINES ROHRS AN EINE BIEGEFORM | [2020/36] | English: | DEVICE FOR AUTOMATICALLY FITTING TUBE TO BENDING MOLD | [2020/36] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'AJUSTEMENT AUTOMATIQUE D'UN TUBE À UN MOULE DE CINTRAGE | [2020/36] | Entry into regional phase | 08.05.2020 | Translation filed | 28.05.2020 | National basic fee paid | 28.05.2020 | Search fee paid | 28.05.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.05.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/36] | 09.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 11.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.02.2024 | BG | 21.02.2024 | ES | 21.02.2024 | FI | 21.02.2024 | HR | 21.02.2024 | LT | 21.02.2024 | LV | 21.02.2024 | NL | 21.02.2024 | PL | 21.02.2024 | NO | 21.05.2024 | RS | 21.05.2024 | GR | 22.05.2024 | IS | 21.06.2024 | PT | 21.06.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 21.02.2024 | |
BG | 21.02.2024 | ||
ES | 21.02.2024 | ||
FI | 21.02.2024 | ||
HR | 21.02.2024 | ||
LT | 21.02.2024 | ||
NL | 21.02.2024 | ||
NO | 21.05.2024 | ||
RS | 21.05.2024 | ||
GR | 22.05.2024 | ||
IS | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 21.02.2024 | |
FI | 21.02.2024 | ||
HR | 21.02.2024 | ||
LT | 21.02.2024 | ||
NL | 21.02.2024 | ||
NO | 21.05.2024 | ||
RS | 21.05.2024 | ||
GR | 22.05.2024 | ||
IS | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 21.02.2024 | |
NO | 21.05.2024 | ||
IS | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 21.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH09164586 (TOKAI RUBBER IND LTD) [A] 1-12* figure 1; claim 1 * | International search | [A]JPS5919111 (NISSAN MOTOR) [A] 1-12 * , *; | [A]JPS6163330 (MARUKOSU ORUMAEKEA MUJIKA) [A] 1-12 * , *; | [A]DE3939352 (BUNDY GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-12 * , *; | [A]US6523388 (WINTON III GEORGE R [US]) [A] 1-12* , *; | [A]US2003042655 (KANE NOMAN F [US]) [A] 1-12 * , *; | [A]WO2006043316 (HAYAKAWA SEISAKUSHO CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-12 * , [0013]-[0016], & CN 101044012 A & TW 200630204 A * | by applicant | JPH09164586 | US2003042655 | JP2011079318 |