EP3750343 - SERVICE FUNCTION CHAINING CONGESTION FEEDBACK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.06.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.11.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 31.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2020/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EASTLAKE, III, Donald Eggleston 155 Beaver Street Milford, Massachusetts 01757 / US | 02 /
MALIS, Andrew G. 30 Kirkland Drive Andover, Massachusetts 01810 / US | [2021/08] |
Former [2020/51] | 01 /
EASTLAKE, Donald E. III 155 Beaver Street Milford, Massachusetts 01757 / US | ||
02 /
MALIS, Andrew G. 30 Kirkland Drive Andover, Massachusetts 01810 / US | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/51] | Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18907106.1 | 26.06.2018 | [2020/51] | WO2018CN92862 | Priority number, date | US201862634584P | 23.02.2018 Original published format: US 201862634584 P | US201815977161 | 11.05.2018 Original published format: US201815977161 | [2020/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019161628 | Date: | 29.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3750343 | Date: | 16.12.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.08.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 29.08.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/24, H04L12/801, H04L12/815 | [2021/14] | CPC: |
H04L47/115 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04L43/091 (EP,KR);
H04L43/062 (CN,KR,US);
H04L47/22 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04L47/2483 (EP,CN,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2020/51] | H04W28/02, H04L12/26 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/51] | Title | German: | DIENSTFUNKTIONSVERKETTUNG MIT ÜBERLASTUNGSFEEDBACK | [2020/51] | English: | SERVICE FUNCTION CHAINING CONGESTION FEEDBACK | [2020/51] | French: | RÉTROACTION DE CONGESTION DE CHAÎNAGE DE FONCTIONS DE SERVICE | [2020/51] | Entry into regional phase | 07.09.2020 | National basic fee paid | 07.09.2020 | Search fee paid | 07.09.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.09.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.09.2020 | Examination requested [2020/51] | 29.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2016065456 (MULEY PRAVEEN VASANT [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0080] * * figures 1, 3 *; | [XY]EP3146672 (NOKIA SOLUTIONS & NETWORKS OY [FI]) [X] 1,4-6,12,14,15 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0052] * * figures 1-7 * [Y] 2,3,7-11,13; | [YA] - QUINN R FERNANDO J GUICHARD S KUMAR CISCO SYSTEMS P ET AL, "Network Service Header; draft-quinn-nsh-01.txt", NETWORK SERVICE HEADER; DRAFT-QUINN-NSH-01.TXT, INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE, IETF; STANDARDWORKINGDRAFT, INTERNET SOCIETY (ISOC) 4, RUE DES FALAISES CH- 1205 GENEVA, SWITZERLAND, (20130713), pages 1 - 21, XP015094307 [Y] 2,3,7-11,13 * page 8, section "3. Network Service Header" * * page 12, section "4. Header Format" * * figures 1-4 * [A] 1,4-6,12,14,15 | [A] - MAHKONEN HEIKKI ET AL, "Elastic network monitoring with virtual probes", 2015 IEEE CONFERENCE ON NETWORK FUNCTION VIRTUALIZATION AND SOFTWARE DEFINED NETWORK (NFV-SDN), IEEE, (20151118), doi:10.1109/NFV-SDN.2015.7387390, pages 1 - 3, XP032852453 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/NFV-SDN.2015.7387390 | International search | [X]WO2013133665 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-20 * description paragraphs 36-111,and figures 1-6 ............................................................................................................................................................................... *; | [A]CN104685919 (ALCATEL LUCENT INC) [A] 1-20* the whole document *; | [A]US2017013502 (BANIEL URI [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2017023741 (CONVIDA WIRELESS LLC [US]) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A]US2017180218 (RASANEN JUHA ANTERO [FI]) [A] 1-20 * the whole document * |