EP3761488 - MOTOR, ELECTRIC BLOWER, ELECTRIC VACUUM CLEANER AND HAND DRYER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.12.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.04.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2021/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TSUCHIDA Kazuchika c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation, 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2021/01] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/01] | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | Application number, filing date | 18907505.4 | 28.02.2018 | [2021/01] | WO2018JP07399 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019167152 | Date: | 06.09.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3761488 | Date: | 06.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.09.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H02K11/215, H02K29/08, H02K1/14, H02K29/03, // H02K1/27 | [2021/09] | CPC: |
H02K1/146 (EP);
H02K11/215 (EP,US);
A45D20/00 (US);
A47L5/22 (US);
F04D25/06 (US);
H02K1/14 (EP);
H02K21/16 (US);
H02K29/03 (EP);
H02K29/08 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/01] | H02K11/215, H02K29/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/01] | Title | German: | MOTOR, ELEKTRISCHES GEBLÄSE, ELEKTRISCHER STAUBSAUGER UND HANDTROCKNER | [2021/01] | English: | MOTOR, ELECTRIC BLOWER, ELECTRIC VACUUM CLEANER AND HAND DRYER | [2021/01] | French: | MOTEUR, SOUFFLANTE ÉLECTRIQUE, ASPIRATEUR ÉLECTRIQUE ET SÈCHE-MAINS | [2021/01] | Entry into regional phase | 21.08.2020 | Translation filed | 21.08.2020 | National basic fee paid | 21.08.2020 | Search fee paid | 21.08.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.08.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.08.2020 | Examination requested [2021/01] | 07.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]DE19533076 (C E SET S R L [IT]); | [XYI]EP1351375 (ASKOLL HOLDING SRL [IT]); | [XYI]EP1997211 (ARCELIK AS [TR]); | [IY]CN102330702 (LUWEI YE); | [IY]CN102938626 (JIANGMEN IDEAR HANYU ELECTRICAL APPLIANCE CO LTD); | [XYI]EP2766984 (DYSON TECHNOLOGY LTD [GB]); | [XYI]CN104967368 (LIU FEIHONG); | [Y]WO2017175387 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP], et al) | International search | [A]JPH07213041 (SHICOH ENG CO LTD) [A] 1-15* , paragraph [0022], fig. 14 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP3693173B (JAPAN SERVO) [Y] 1-15 * , paragraphs [0005], [0006], fig. 4 & US 2004/0075407 A1, paragraph [0012], fig. 1 & EP 1411627 A2 *; | [Y]JP2007322227 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [Y] 1-15 * , claims 1-2, paragraphs [0053]-[0064], fig. 5 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP3208939U (JOHNSON ELECTRIC S.A.) [Y] 12-15 * , claims 1, 13-15, fig. 22, 23, 25 & US 2016/0341219 A1 & US 2017/0054352 A1, claims 1, 16-18, fig. 22, 23, 25 & CN 106469966 A & CN 205319910 U * | by applicant | JP2010207082 |