EP3734174 - COMMUNICATION IMPLEMENTATION METHOD AND DEVICE FOR AIR CONDITIONING UNIT, STORAGE MEDIUM AND PROCESSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.01.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.10.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gree Electric Appliances, Inc. of Zhuhai West Jinji Road Qianshan Zhuhai, Guangdong 519070 / CN | [2020/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANG, Jie West Jinji Road Qianshan Zhuhai, Guangdong 519070 / CN | 02 /
YE, Tieying West Jinji Road Qianshan Zhuhai, Guangdong 519070 / CN | 03 /
YU, Weiyou West Jinji Road Qianshan Zhuhai, Guangdong 519070 / CN | 04 /
WANG, Wencan West Jinji Road Qianshan Zhuhai, Guangdong 519070 / CN | 05 /
DENG, Zhongwen West Jinji Road Qianshan Zhuhai, Guangdong 519070 / CN | 06 /
LIU, Quanzhou West Jinji Road Qianshan Zhuhai, Guangdong 519070 / CN | 07 /
HUANG, Qiang West Jinji Road Qianshan Zhuhai, Guangdong 519070 / CN | 08 /
YANG, Du West Jinji Road Qianshan Zhuhai, Guangdong 519070 / CN | 09 /
LI, Zhongzheng West Jinji Road Qianshan Zhuhai, Guangdong 519070 / CN | [2020/45] | Representative(s) | Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/45] | Nevett, Duncan Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | Application number, filing date | 18907623.5 | 14.12.2018 | [2020/45] | WO2018CN121133 | Priority number, date | CN201810176093 | 02.03.2018 Original published format: CN201810176093 | [2020/45] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019165825 | Date: | 06.09.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3734174 | Date: | 04.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 06.09.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F24F11/56, H04B3/54, H04L5/00 | [2021/12] | CPC: |
F24F11/56 (EP,CN,US);
F24F11/46 (US);
F24F11/61 (EP,CN);
F24F11/64 (EP,CN);
F24F11/89 (US);
H04B3/54 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2020/45] | F24F11/56 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/45] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR KOMMUNIKATIONSIMPLEMENTIERUNG UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR KLIMAANLAGE, SPEICHERMEDIUM UND PROZESSOR | [2020/45] | English: | COMMUNICATION IMPLEMENTATION METHOD AND DEVICE FOR AIR CONDITIONING UNIT, STORAGE MEDIUM AND PROCESSOR | [2020/45] | French: | PROC& XC9;D& XC9; ET DISPOSITIF DE MISE EN & X152;UVRE DE COMMUNICATION POUR UNE UNIT& XC9; DE CONDITIONNEMENT D'AIR, SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE ET PROCESSEUR | [2020/45] | Entry into regional phase | 30.07.2020 | Translation filed | 30.07.2020 | National basic fee paid | 30.07.2020 | Search fee paid | 30.07.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.07.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/45] | 09.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.06.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]US2001008391 (YUASA NAOKI [JP]) [I] 1-3,9-13 * paragraphs [0005] - [0014] * [A] 4-8; | [IA]CN104253631 (DAI HANLOU) [I] 1,10-13 * paragraphs [0002] - [0005] *[A] 2-9 |