EP3597168 - COSMETIC CONTAINER HAVING MASSAGE FUNCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.03.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.02.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.12.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.2024 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states P.G.C.D. Japan, Inc. 7-4-2 Minami-Aoyama Minato-ku Tokyo 107-0062 / JP | [2020/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NODA, Taihei c/o P.G.C.D. JAPAN, Inc. 4F Yebisu Garden Place Tower, 4-20-3, Ebisu, Shibuya-ku Tokyo 150-6018 / JP | [2020/04] | Representative(s) | Berger, Helmut Weinstein Services & Conseils 2-10 Avenue Marc Sangnier 92390 Villeneuve-la-Garenne / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2020/04] | Lefevre-Groboillot, David André Cabinet Weinstein 176 avenue Charles de Gaulle 92200 Neuilly sur Seine / FR | Application number, filing date | 18907747.2 | 29.11.2018 | [2020/04] | WO2018JP44095 | Priority number, date | JP20180033222 | 27.02.2018 Original published format: JP 2018033222 | [2020/04] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019167369 | Date: | 06.09.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3597168 | Date: | 22.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.09.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61H7/00, A45D24/22, A45D34/04, A46B3/22, A46B11/02 | [2020/04] | CPC: |
A61H7/002 (EP);
A45D24/26 (US);
A45D24/22 (EP);
A45D34/04 (EP,US);
A46B3/22 (EP);
A61H7/003 (EP,US);
A45D2034/005 (US);
A61H2201/0153 (EP);
A61H2201/0157 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/04] | Title | German: | KOSMETIKBEHÄLTER MIT MASSAGEFUNKTION | [2020/04] | English: | COSMETIC CONTAINER HAVING MASSAGE FUNCTION | [2020/04] | French: | RÉCIPIENT COSMÉTIQUE AYANT UNE FONCTION DE MASSAGE | [2020/04] | Entry into regional phase | 18.09.2019 | Translation filed | 15.10.2019 | National basic fee paid | 15.10.2019 | Search fee paid | 15.10.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.10.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.10.2019 | Examination requested [2020/04] | 12.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.02.2023 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 05.04.2023 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | 06.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.07.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO9926596 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [I] 1-3 * pages 8-24; figure - *; | [I]JP2002326677 (HOYU KK) [I] 1-3 * paragraphs [0027] - [0090]; figure - *; | [A]US2004016440 (DE LAFORCADE VINCENT [FR], et al) [A] 1* paragraphs [0067] - [0075]; figure 3 * | International search | [A]JP2005328918 (UNI CHARM CORP) [A] 1-3* , paragraphs [0036]-[0054], fig. 1-5 & US 2005/0257800 A1, paragraphs [0053]-[0073], fig. 1-5 *; | [A]US2009320868 (WANG JEN CHUAN [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * , paragraphs [0013]-[0014], fig. 1-2 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2012236016 (KAO CORP) [A] 1-3 * , paragraph [0022], fig. 1 & US 2014/0130823 A1, paragraph [0051], fig. 1 *; | [A]WO2016153248 (JEON JEONG HO [KR]) [A] 1-3 * , paragraph [0081], fig. 16 & US 2018/0027942 A1, paragraph [0070], fig. 16 *; | [A]JP3207092U (LEBEN HANBAI KK) [A] 1-3 * , paragraphs [0022]-[0084], fig. 1-14 (Family: none) * | by applicant | JPS5820603U | JP2004329440 |