EP3758918 - BINDER JETTING ADDITIVE MANUFACTURING WITH A PATTERNED BREAKABLE CONNECTION BY GAS PRECURSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2021/01] | THREE-DIMENSIONAL PRINTING | ||
[2023/45] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.01.2024 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.10.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.12.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LV, PL, PT | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P. 10300 Energy Drive Spring, TX 77389 / US | [2023/45] |
Former [2021/01] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P. 10300 Energy Drive Spring TX 77389 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHAARAWI, Mohammed S. 1070 NE Circle Blvd. Corvallis, Oregon 97330-4239 / US | 02 /
MCKINNELL, James 1070 NE Circle Blvd. Corvallis, Oregon 97330-4239 / US | 03 /
CHAMPION, David A. 1070 NE Circle Blvd. Corvallis, Oregon 97330-4239 / US | 04 /
KASPERCHIK, Vladek 1070 NE Circle Blvd. Corvallis, Oregon 97330-4239 / US | [2021/01] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP One Portwall Square Portwall Lane Bristol BS1 6BH / GB | [2024/08] |
Former [2021/01] | HGF 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | Application number, filing date | 18907887.6 | 28.02.2018 | [2021/01] | WO2018US20169 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019168516 | Date: | 06.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3758918 | Date: | 06.01.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.09.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3758918 | Date: | 21.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 06.09.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B29C64/165, B33Y40/00, B29C64/40, B29C64/30, B22F10/64, B22F10/47, B22F10/43, B22F5/00, B22F3/10, B22F1/00, B22F10/14, B33Y70/00, B33Y10/00, B33Y80/00, B22F1/05, B33Y40/20 | [2023/44] | CPC: |
B33Y10/00 (EP,US);
B22F5/003 (EP,US);
B22F1/05 (EP,US);
B22F10/00 (US);
B22F10/14 (EP,US);
B22F10/32 (US);
B22F10/43 (EP,US);
B22F10/47 (EP,US);
B22F10/64 (EP,US);
B22F10/68 (US);
B22F10/85 (US);
B22F3/1021 (EP,US);
B29C64/165 (EP,US);
B29C64/30 (EP);
B29C64/393 (US);
B29C64/40 (EP);
B33Y30/00 (US);
B33Y40/00 (EP,US);
B33Y40/20 (EP,US);
B33Y50/02 (US);
B33Y70/00 (EP,US);
B33Y70/10 (US);
B33Y80/00 (US);
C09D11/033 (US);
C09D11/38 (US);
B22F2201/013 (EP,US);
B22F2302/10 (US);
B22F2302/45 (US);
B22F2998/10 (EP,US);
B22F2999/00 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
B22F2998/10, B22F10/14, B22F3/1017, B22F2201/013, B22F5/003 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2021/42] | B29C64/165, B33Y80/00, B33Y10/00, B33Y70/00, B22F10/14, B22F1/00, B22F3/10, B22F5/00, B22F10/43, B22F10/47, B22F10/64, B29C64/30, B29C64/40, B33Y40/00 | ||
Former IPC [2021/01] | B29C64/165, B33Y80/00, B33Y10/00, B33Y70/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GENERATIVE FERTIGUNG DURCH BINDER JETTING MIT EINER AUFBRECHBAREN VERBINDUNG MITTELS EINES GASVORLÄUFERS | [2023/45] | English: | BINDER JETTING ADDITIVE MANUFACTURING WITH A PATTERNED BREAKABLE CONNECTION BY GAS PRECURSOR | [2023/45] | French: | FABRICATION ADDITIVE PAR JET DE LIANT AVEC UNE CONNEXION CASSABLE PAR PRÉCURSEUR DE GAZ | [2023/45] |
Former [2021/01] | DREIDIMENSIONALES DRUCKEN | ||
Former [2021/01] | THREE-DIMENSIONAL PRINTING | ||
Former [2021/01] | IMPRESSION EN TROIS DIMENSIONS | Entry into regional phase | 21.05.2020 | National basic fee paid | 21.05.2020 | Search fee paid | 21.05.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.05.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.05.2020 | Examination requested [2021/01] | 31.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 09.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.02.2024 | BG | 21.02.2024 | ES | 21.02.2024 | FI | 21.02.2024 | HR | 21.02.2024 | LT | 21.02.2024 | LV | 21.02.2024 | NL | 21.02.2024 | PL | 21.02.2024 | NO | 21.05.2024 | RS | 21.05.2024 | GR | 22.05.2024 | IS | 21.06.2024 | PT | 21.06.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 21.02.2024 | |
BG | 21.02.2024 | ||
ES | 21.02.2024 | ||
FI | 21.02.2024 | ||
HR | 21.02.2024 | ||
LT | 21.02.2024 | ||
NL | 21.02.2024 | ||
NO | 21.05.2024 | ||
RS | 21.05.2024 | ||
GR | 22.05.2024 | ||
IS | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 21.02.2024 | |
FI | 21.02.2024 | ||
HR | 21.02.2024 | ||
LT | 21.02.2024 | ||
NL | 21.02.2024 | ||
NO | 21.05.2024 | ||
RS | 21.05.2024 | ||
GR | 22.05.2024 | ||
IS | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 21.02.2024 | |
NO | 21.05.2024 | ||
IS | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 21.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2008090719 (WADA MASAHIRO [JP], et al); | [A]US2017066197 (MORIKAWA TAKASHI [JP], et al) | International search | [A]US2016207112 (PALLARI JARI HEIKKI PETTERI [FI]); | [A]WO2017014785 (HEWLETT PACKARD DEVELOPMENT CO LP [US]); | [A]US2017266882 (YAN CHUNZE [CN], et al); | [XA]US2017297106 (MYERBERG JONAH SAMUEL [US], et al) | by applicant | US2017066197 |