EP3761640 - ENCODING METHOD AND DEVICE THEREOF, AND DECODING METHOD AND DEVICE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.04.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.12.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2021/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JEONG, Seung-soo 101-1501 24, Jungdae-ro Songpa-gu Seoul 05834 / KR | 02 /
PARK, Minwoo 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2021/01] | Representative(s) | Appleyard Lees IP LLP 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [2021/01] | Application number, filing date | 18907926.2 | 13.07.2018 | [2021/01] | WO2018KR07973 | Priority number, date | US201862636459P | 28.02.2018 Original published format: US 201862636459 P | [2021/01] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019168244 | Date: | 06.09.2019 | Language: | KO | [2019/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3761640 | Date: | 06.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 06.09.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/52, H04N19/70 | [2022/02] | CPC: |
H04N19/52 (EP);
H04N19/513 (KR);
H04N19/573 (CN);
H04N19/159 (CN,US);
H04N19/103 (CN);
H04N19/105 (CN,US);
H04N19/109 (KR);
H04N19/139 (KR);
H04N19/176 (CN,US);
|
Former IPC [2021/01] | H04N19/103, H04N19/573, H04N19/176 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/01] | Title | German: | KODIERUNGSVERFAHREN UND ZUGEHÖRIGE VORRICHTUNG, UND DEKODIERUNGSVERFAHREN UND ZUGEHÖRIGE VORRICHTUNG | [2021/01] | English: | ENCODING METHOD AND DEVICE THEREOF, AND DECODING METHOD AND DEVICE THEREOF | [2021/01] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE CODAGE ET DISPOSITIF ASSOCIÉ, ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉCODAGE ET DISPOSITIF ASSOCIÉ | [2021/01] | Entry into regional phase | 21.07.2020 | Translation filed | 21.07.2020 | National basic fee paid | 21.07.2020 | Search fee paid | 21.07.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.07.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.07.2020 | Examination requested [2021/01] | 08.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.04.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.08.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2013040394 (QUALCOMM INC [US], et al) [X] 1-5 * paragraphs [0099] , [ 100]; figure 13 *; | [X]EP3203743 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-5 * figure 1B; claim 1 *; | [X] - "Algorithm description of Joint Exploration Test Model 2 (JEM2)", no. n16066, (20160404), 114. MPEG MEETING; 20160222 - 20160226; SAN DIEGO; (MOTION PICTURE EXPERT GROUP OR ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11),, URL: http://phenix.int-evry.fr/mpeg/doc_end_user/documents/114_San%20Diego/wg11/w16066-v2-w16066.zip w16066.doc, (20160404), XP030022739 [X] 1-5 * paragraph [2.4.2] * | [XP] - ALSHIN A ET AL, "Description of SDR, HDR and 360° video coding technology proposal by Samsung, Huawei, GoPro, and HiSilicon - mobile application scenario", no. JVET-J0024, (20180414), 10. JVET MEETING; 20180410 - 20180420; SAN DIEGO; (THE JOINT VIDEO EXPLORATION TEAM OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ),, URL: http://phenix.int-evry.fr/jvet/doc_end_user/documents/10_San%20Diego/wg11/JVET-J0024-v5.zip JVET-J0024_v4.docx, (20180414), XP030248222 [XP] 1-5 * paragraph [3.1.4.4] * | International search | [A]JP2010200147 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1-15; | [Y]KR20140032930 (PANASONIC CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-15; | [A]JP2016158258 (SUN PATENT TRUST)[A] 1-15; | [Y]KR20170078672 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 1-15; | [Y]KR20170140196 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [Y] 9 |