EP3744905 - REMOTE OPERATION SYSTEM AND MAIN OPERATING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.09.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.10.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.07.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.10.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.10.2024 [2024/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KOBELCO CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY CO., LTD. 2-1, Itsukaichikou 2-chome Saeki-ku Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima 731-5161 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2020/49] | For all designated states KOBELCO CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY CO., LTD. 2-1, Itsukaichikou 2-chome Saeki-ku Hiroshima-shi Hiroshima 731-5161 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SASAKI, Hitoshi c/o KOBELCO CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY CO., LTD. Hiroshima-Head Office 2-1, Itsukaichikou 2-chome, Saeki-ku, Hiroshima-shi Hiroshima 731-5161 / JP | 02 /
SAIKI, Seiji c/o KOBELCO CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY CO., LTD. Hiroshima-Head Office 2-1, Itsukaichikou 2-chome, Saeki-ku, Hiroshima-shi Hiroshima 731-5161 / JP | 03 /
YAMAZAKI, Yoichiro c/o KOBELCO CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY CO., LTD. Hiroshima-Head Office 2-1, Itsukaichikou 2-chome, Saeki-ku, Hiroshima-shi Hiroshima 731-5161 / JP | [2020/49] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2020/49] | Application number, filing date | 18910268.4 | 11.12.2018 | [2020/49] | WO2018JP45568 | Priority number, date | JP20180055949 | 23.03.2018 Original published format: JP 2018055949 | [2020/49] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019181103 | Date: | 26.09.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3744905 | Date: | 02.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3744905 | Date: | 15.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 26.09.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | E02F9/20, H04Q9/00 | [2020/49] | CPC: |
E02F9/205 (EP,US);
G05D1/0022 (US);
H04Q9/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FERNBEDIENUNGSSYSTEM UND HAUPTBETRIEBSVORRICHTUNG | [2020/49] | English: | REMOTE OPERATION SYSTEM AND MAIN OPERATING DEVICE | [2020/49] | French: | SYSTÈME DE FONCTIONNEMENT À DISTANCE ET DISPOSITIF D'ACTIONNEMENT PRINCIPAL | [2020/49] | Entry into regional phase | 26.08.2020 | Translation filed | 26.08.2020 | National basic fee paid | 26.08.2020 | Search fee paid | 26.08.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.08.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.08.2020 | Examination requested [2020/49] | 05.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 09.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 19.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.11.2023 | CZ | 15.11.2023 | DK | 15.11.2023 | EE | 15.11.2023 | ES | 15.11.2023 | HR | 15.11.2023 | LT | 15.11.2023 | LV | 15.11.2023 | MC | 15.11.2023 | NL | 15.11.2023 | PL | 15.11.2023 | RO | 15.11.2023 | RS | 15.11.2023 | SE | 15.11.2023 | SK | 15.11.2023 | SM | 15.11.2023 | LU | 11.12.2023 | BG | 15.02.2024 | NO | 15.02.2024 | GR | 16.02.2024 | IS | 15.03.2024 | PT | 15.03.2024 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
CZ | 15.11.2023 | ||
DK | 15.11.2023 | ||
EE | 15.11.2023 | ||
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
LV | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RO | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SE | 15.11.2023 | ||
SK | 15.11.2023 | ||
SM | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
CZ | 15.11.2023 | ||
DK | 15.11.2023 | ||
EE | 15.11.2023 | ||
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
LV | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RO | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SE | 15.11.2023 | ||
SM | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
DK | 15.11.2023 | ||
EE | 15.11.2023 | ||
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
LV | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SE | 15.11.2023 | ||
SM | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
DK | 15.11.2023 | ||
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
LV | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SE | 15.11.2023 | ||
SM | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
LV | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SE | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SE | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 15.11.2023 | |
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 16.02.2024 | |
IS | 15.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JPH10252101 (SHIMIZU CONSTRUCTION CO LTD) [AD] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]EP3225750 (KOMATSU MFG CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-6* paragraph [0069] - paragraph [0077]; figure 5 * | International search | [A]JPH10277976 (FUJITA CORP) [A] 1-6 * , [0001] - [0007], *; | [A]JP2002038528 (NIPPON SHARYO SEIZO KK) [A] 1-6 * , [0001], *; | [A]US2016224021 (KUIKKA PETRI [FI]) [A] 1-6* , [0086] - [0102], FIG.8-FIG.9 & WO 2014/177755 A1 *; | [A]JP2016196064 (KOWATECH CO LTD) [A] 1-6 * , [0001], * | by applicant | JPH10252101 |