26.03.2025 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.09.2024 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
27.03.2024 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.03.2024 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
15.03.2024 |
First examination report |
|
14.03.2024 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
08.03.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.07.2022 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
08.03.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.01.2022 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 26.01.2022 [2022/04] |
24.12.2021 |
Change - classification |
published on 26.01.2022 [2022/04] |
24.12.2021 |
Change - classification |
published on 26.01.2022 [2022/04] |
24.09.2021 |
Change - classification |
published on 27.10.2021 [2021/43] |
24.09.2021 |
Change - classification |
published on 27.10.2021 [2021/43] |
28.05.2021 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 30.06.2021 [2021/26] |
28.05.2021 |
Change - extension states |
published on 30.06.2021 [2021/26] |
01.05.2021 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
30.03.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.12.2020 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 27.01.2021 [2021/04] |
25.12.2020 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 27.01.2021 [2021/04] |
04.12.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.09.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.08.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.08.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.08.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.08.2020 |
Change - representative |
|
14.08.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.09.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.09.2019 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|