EP3769871 - SURFACE-COATED CUTTING TOOL AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.12.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Electric Hardmetal Corp. 1-1, Koyakita 1-chome Itami-shi, Hyogo 664-0016 / JP | [2021/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PASEUTH, Anongsack c/o SUMITOMO ELECTRIC HARDMETAL CORP., 1-1, Koyakita 1-chome Itami-shi, Hyogo 664-0016 / JP | 02 /
KIDO, Yasuki c/o SUMITOMO ELECTRIC HARDMETAL CORP., 1-1, Koyakita 1-chome Itami-shi, Hyogo 664-0016 / JP | 03 /
OKUNO, Susumu c/o SUMITOMO ELECTRIC HARDMETAL CORP., 1-1, Koyakita 1-chome Itami-shi, Hyogo 664-0016 / JP | 04 /
IMAMURA, Shinya c/o SUMITOMO ELECTRIC HARDMETAL CORP., 1-1, Koyakita 1-chome Itami-shi, Hyogo 664-0016 / JP | [2021/04] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [2021/04] | Application number, filing date | 18911128.9 | 27.12.2018 | [2021/04] | WO2018JP48017 | Priority number, date | JP20180054713 | 22.03.2018 Original published format: JP 2018054713 | [2021/04] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019181133 | Date: | 26.09.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3769871 | Date: | 27.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 26.09.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C23C16/34, C23C16/455, C23C28/04, C23C28/00, C23C30/00 | [2021/51] | CPC: |
C23C16/34 (EP,KR,US);
B23B27/14 (KR);
B23B27/148 (US);
B23B51/00 (KR,US);
B23C5/16 (KR);
B23C5/165 (US);
B23D77/00 (KR,US);
B23F21/00 (EP,KR);
B23G5/06 (KR);
C23C16/45508 (EP);
C23C16/45512 (EP);
C23C16/45578 (EP);
C23C28/042 (EP);
C23C28/42 (EP);
C23C28/44 (EP);
C23C30/005 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/04] | B23B27/14, B23B51/00, B23C5/16, B23D77/00, B23F21/00, B23G5/06, C23C16/34 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/04] | Title | German: | OBERFLÄCHENBESCHICHTETES SCHNEIDWERKZEUG UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2021/04] | English: | SURFACE-COATED CUTTING TOOL AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREFOR | [2021/04] | French: | OUTIL DE COUPE À SURFACE REVÊTUE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2021/04] | Entry into regional phase | 15.09.2020 | Translation filed | 15.09.2020 | National basic fee paid | 15.09.2020 | Search fee paid | 15.09.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.09.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.09.2020 | Examination requested [2021/04] | 23.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2015345013 (PASEUTH ANONGSACK [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0069] - [0086] *; | [A]US2017021429 (PASEUTH ANONGSACK [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [X]WO2017175398 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC HARDMETAL CORP [JP]) [X] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [P]US2018135168 (PASEUTH ANONGSACK [JP], et al) [P] * paragraphs [0045] - [0054] - [0145] - [0150]; tables 3-5 * | International search | [A]JP2008545063 (FRAUNHOFER-GESELLSCHAFT ZUR FÖRDERUNG DER ANGEWANDTEN FORSCHUNG E.V.) [A] 1 * , paragraphs [0001]-[0004], [0026]-[0028], fig. 2 & US 2009/01123779 A1, paragraphs [0001]-[0004], [0024]-[0026], fig. 2 & WO 2007/003648 A1 & DE 102005032860 A1 & CA 2613091 A1 & KR 10-2008-0028980 A & CN 101218370 A *; | [A]JP2014133267 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP) [A] 1, 5 * , paragraphs [0014]-[0024], fig. 1, 2 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2014210313 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP) [A] 1-2, 5* , paragraphs [0025]-[0028], fig. 1, 2 & CN 104108014 A *; | [A]JP2015124407 (SUMITOMO ELEC HARDMETAL CORP) [A] 1, 5 * , paragraphs [0001], [0031]-[0033], [0065]-[0079], fig. 1-3 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2018504515 (BOEHLERIT GMBH & CO. KG.) [A] 1, 5 * , paragraphs [0037], [0038], [0042], [0043], fig. 1-4 & US 2018/0023194 A1, paragraphs [0044], [0045], [0049], [0050], fig. 1-4 & WO 2016/112417 A1 *; | [A] - KECKES, J. et al., "Self-organized periodic soft- hard nanolamellae in polycrystalline TiAIN thin films", Thin Solid Films, (20130809), vol. 545, doi:doi:10.1016/j.tsf.2013.08.001, pages 29 - 32, XP055636673 [A] 1-4 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.tsf.2013.08.001 | by applicant | JP2015509858 | JP2016130343 | JP2017508632 | JP2018054713 |