EP3780139 - BATTERY MODULE, AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING BATTERY MODULE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.03.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.07.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Envision AESC Japan Ltd. 10-1, Hironodai 2-chome Zama-shi, Kanagawa 252-0012 / JP | [2021/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUKUOKA, Manabu c/o NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD., Intellectual Property Department, 1-1, Morinosatoaoyama Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP | 02 /
NAKAI, Masayuki c/o NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD., Intellectual Property Department, 1-1, Morinosatoaoyama Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP | 03 /
TAKAYAMA, Gen c/o NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD., Intellectual Property Department, 1-1, Morinosatoaoyama Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP | 04 /
MOTOHASHI, Yuta c/o NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD., Intellectual Property Department, 1-1, Morinosatoaoyama Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP | 05 /
KISHIDA, Fumio c/o NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD., Intellectual Property Department, 1-1, Morinosatoaoyama Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP | 06 /
NAKAMOTO, Masahiro c/o NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD., Intellectual Property Department, 1-1, Morinosatoaoyama Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP | [2021/07] | Representative(s) | Santarelli Tour Trinity 1 bis Esplanade de la Défense 92035 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2021/07] | Santarelli 49, avenue des Champs-Elysées 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 18912160.1 | 30.03.2018 | [2021/07] | WO2018JP13744 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019187043 | Date: | 03.10.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3780139 | Date: | 17.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.10.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H01M50/204, H01M50/209, H01M50/289 | [2021/11] | CPC: |
H01M50/204 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/20 (KR);
H01M10/281 (US);
H01M50/209 (KR);
H01M50/211 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/289 (EP,KR);
H01M50/291 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/293 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/54 (US);
|
Former IPC [2021/07] | H01M2/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/07] | Title | German: | BATTERIEMODUL UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES BATTERIEMODULS | [2021/07] | English: | BATTERY MODULE, AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING BATTERY MODULE | [2021/07] | French: | MODULE DE BATTERIE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE MODULE DE BATTERIE | [2021/07] | Entry into regional phase | 19.08.2020 | Translation filed | 19.08.2020 | National basic fee paid | 19.08.2020 | Search fee paid | 19.08.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.08.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.10.2018 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 19.08.2020 | Examination requested [2021/07] | 20.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.07.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2007224498 (KIM KIJAE [KR], et al) [A] 1-9,11-15 * the whole document *; | [X]US2015303425 (KONG MING ZHE [KR]) [X] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [X]US2016093849 (DEKEUSTER RICHARD M [US], et al) [X] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]US2017098855 (KARDITSAS NICK [US], et al) [A] 1-9,11-15* the whole document * | International search | [A]JP2006147531 (NISSAN MOTOR) [A] 1-15 * , paragraphs [0019]-[0044], fig. 5-10 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2006172994 (NISSAN MOTOR) [A] 1-15 * , claims 1-9 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2014078498 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1-15* , paragraph [0036], fig. 10 (Family: none) *; | [XA]US2015303425 (KONG MING ZHE [KR]) [X] 1, 2, 8-10 * , paragraph [0039], fig. 5 & WO 2014/081193 A1 & KR 10-2014-0064418 A & CN 204905313 U * [A] 3-7, 11-15 | by applicant | JP2015002264 |