EP3771261 - PAGING SYNCHRONIZATION INDICATION METHOD AND DEVICE, PAGING SYNCHRONIZATION METHOD, AND DEVICE AND BASE STATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.12.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.10.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.12.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beijing Xiaomi Mobile Software Co., Ltd. No. 018, Floor 8, Building 6, Yard 33 Middle Xierqi Road Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [2024/03] |
Former [2021/04] | For all designated states Beijing Xiaomi Mobile Software Co., Ltd. No. 018, floor 8, building 6, yard 33 Middle Xierqi Road Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Yang No.018, Floor 8, Building 6, Yard 33 Middle Xierqi Road Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [2021/04] | Representative(s) | Dehns Germany Partnerschaft mbB Theresienstraße 6-8 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2024/03] | Kudlek, Franz Thomas, et al Dehns Germany Theresienstraße 6-8 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2021/04] | Kudlek, Franz Thomas Dehns Germany Theresienstraße 6-8 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18913019.8 | 28.03.2018 | [2021/04] | WO2018CN80952 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019183854 | Date: | 03.10.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3771261 | Date: | 27.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3771261 | Date: | 17.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 03.10.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04W52/02, H04W56/00, H04W68/00 | [2021/49] | CPC: |
H04W68/005 (EP,CN,US);
H04W52/0216 (EP,CN,US);
H04W56/00 (CN);
H04W56/001 (US);
H04W56/0015 (EP);
H04W68/02 (US);
H04W72/30 (US);
H04W76/27 (CN,US);
H04W76/40 (CN);
Y02D30/70 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/04] | H04W56/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FUNKRUFSYNCHRONISATIONSANZEIGEVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG, FUNKRUFSYNCHRONISATIONSVERFAHREN SOWIE VORRICHTUNG UND BASISSTATION | [2021/04] | English: | PAGING SYNCHRONIZATION INDICATION METHOD AND DEVICE, PAGING SYNCHRONIZATION METHOD, AND DEVICE AND BASE STATION | [2021/04] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF D'INDICATION DE SYNCHRONISATION DE RADIOMESSAGERIE, PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE SYNCHRONISATION DE RADIOMESSAGERIE ET STATION DE BASE | [2021/04] | Entry into regional phase | 20.10.2020 | Translation filed | 20.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 20.10.2020 | Search fee paid | 20.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/04] | 16.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.12.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 13.12.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.12.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.01.2024 | BG | 17.01.2024 | ES | 17.01.2024 | FI | 17.01.2024 | HR | 17.01.2024 | LT | 17.01.2024 | LV | 17.01.2024 | NL | 17.01.2024 | PL | 17.01.2024 | SE | 17.01.2024 | NO | 17.04.2024 | RS | 17.04.2024 | GR | 18.04.2024 | IS | 17.05.2024 | PT | 17.05.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 17.01.2024 | |
BG | 17.01.2024 | ||
ES | 17.01.2024 | ||
FI | 17.01.2024 | ||
HR | 17.01.2024 | ||
LT | 17.01.2024 | ||
LV | 17.01.2024 | ||
NL | 17.01.2024 | ||
PL | 17.01.2024 | ||
NO | 17.04.2024 | ||
RS | 17.04.2024 | ||
GR | 18.04.2024 | ||
IS | 17.05.2024 | ||
PT | 17.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 17.01.2024 | |
BG | 17.01.2024 | ||
ES | 17.01.2024 | ||
FI | 17.01.2024 | ||
HR | 17.01.2024 | ||
LT | 17.01.2024 | ||
NL | 17.01.2024 | ||
NO | 17.04.2024 | ||
RS | 17.04.2024 | ||
GR | 18.04.2024 | ||
IS | 17.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 17.01.2024 | |
FI | 17.01.2024 | ||
HR | 17.01.2024 | ||
LT | 17.01.2024 | ||
NL | 17.01.2024 | ||
NO | 17.04.2024 | ||
RS | 17.04.2024 | ||
GR | 18.04.2024 | ||
IS | 17.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 17.01.2024 | |
NL | 17.01.2024 | ||
NO | 17.04.2024 | ||
IS | 17.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | NL | 17.01.2024 | |
IS | 17.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/31] | NL | 17.01.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - CATT, "Issues on RX Beam Sweeping for Paging", vol. RAN WG2, no. Athens, Greece; 20180226 - 20180302, (20180212), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-1801838 ISSUES ON RX BEAM SWEEPING FOR PAGING, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg%5Fran/WG2%5FRL2/TSGR2%5F101/Docs/, (20180212), XP051398934 [A] 1-14 * Section 2 * | [A] - ERICSSON, "Additional synchronization provision", vol. RAN WG1, no. Prague, Czech Republic; 20171009 - 20171013, (20171008), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1717761_ADDITIONAL_SYNC_PROVISIONING, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20171008), XP051340946 [A] 1-14 * Section 2.3 * | [A] - ERICSSON, "Paging design", vol. RAN WG1, no. Prague, Czech Republic; 20171009 - 20171013, (20171008), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1718714_PAGING, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20171008), XP051341887 [A] 1-14 * Section 2.2 * | [A] - ERICSSON, "Additional synchronization provision", vol. RAN WG1, no. Prague, Czech Republic; 20171009 - 20171013, (20171003), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1717761_ADDITIONAL_SYNC_PROVISIONING, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_90b/Docs/, (20171003), XP051352744 [A] 1-14 * Section 2.3 * | International search | [A]US2017094624 (BALACHANDRAN KUMAR [US], et al)[A] 1-16; | [A]CN106793058 (SPREADTRUM COMM SHANGHAI CO ) [A] 1-16; | [A]CN107124767 (ZTE CORP) [A] 1-16; | [A] - ERICSSON, "Synchronization using non- cell -defining signals", 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 Meeting #91, R1-1720944, (20171118), XP051370318 [A] 1-16 * , * | [A] - SAMSUNG, "Remaining details on synchronization signal", 3GPP TSG RAN WGl#90b, R1-1717576, (20171002), XP051340762 [A] 1-16 |