EP3779321 - TRACKING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.08.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.05.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.09.2024 [2024/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Solar Avances y Sistemas de Energía, S.L. c/ Gabriel Miró, 43 03750 Alicante / ES | [2021/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ASKINS, Stephen Alexander Avda. Del Manzanares 16, 7ºA 28011 Madrid / ES | 02 /
CASELLES FORNÉS, Jaime Partida Cometes Nº28 03750 Pedreguer / ES | 03 /
ANTÓN HERNÁNDEZ, Ignacio Calle Santísima Trinidad 3, 6ºA 28010 Madrid / ES | 04 /
PÉREZ, Marta Victoria Plaza Camilo José Cela, 2 5ºA 30008 Murcia / ES | [2023/42] |
Former [2021/07] | 01 /
ASKINS, Stephen Alexander Avda. Del Manzanares 16, 7ºA 28011 Madrid / ES | ||
02 /
CASELLES FORNÉS, Jaime Partida Cometes Nº28 03750 Pedreguer / ES | |||
03 /
ANTÓN HERNÁNDEZ, Ignacio Calle Santísima Trinidad 3, 6ºA 28010 Madrid / ES | |||
04 /
PÉREZ, Marta Victoria plaza Camilo José Cela, 2 5ºA 30008 Murcia / ES | Representative(s) | Elzaburu S.L.P. Edificio Torre de Cristal Paseo de la Castellana 259 C, planta 28 28046 Madrid / ES | [2023/42] |
Former [2021/07] | Elzaburu S.L.P. Miguel Angel 21, 2nd floor 28010 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 18914062.7 | 13.04.2018 | [2021/07] | WO2018ES70303 | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019197689 | Date: | 17.10.2019 | Language: | ES | [2019/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3779321 | Date: | 17.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3779321 | Date: | 18.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 17.10.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F24S50/20, F24S30/40, H02S20/32, F24S23/30, F24S23/70, F24S30/425, // F24S30/00, F24S23/74, F24S23/77 | [2021/18] | CPC: |
F24S23/30 (EP,IL);
F24S30/40 (EP,IL,KR,US);
H02S20/32 (EP,IL,KR,US);
F24S23/31 (EP,IL);
F24S23/70 (EP,IL);
F24S23/74 (EP,IL,US);
F24S23/77 (EP,IL);
F24S30/425 (EP,IL);
F24S50/20 (EP,IL,KR,US);
G02B19/0009 (IL,US);
G02B19/0042 (IL,US);
G02B3/08 (IL,US);
G05D3/105 (IL,US);
H02S40/22 (IL,US);
F24S2023/84 (EP,IL);
F24S2030/11 (EP,IL);
Y02E10/47 (EP,IL,KR);
Y02E10/50 (IL,KR);
Y02E10/52 (EP,IL)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/07] | F24S50/20, F24S30/40, H02S20/32 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFOLGUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2021/07] | English: | TRACKING DEVICE | [2021/07] | French: | DISPOSITIF SUIVEUR | [2021/07] | Entry into regional phase | 13.11.2020 | Translation filed | 13.11.2020 | National basic fee paid | 13.11.2020 | Search fee paid | 13.11.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.11.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/07] | 03.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 13.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 19.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 18.10.2023 | HR | 18.10.2023 | PL | 18.10.2023 | RO | 18.10.2023 | RS | 18.10.2023 | SK | 18.10.2023 | SM | 18.10.2023 | NO | 18.01.2024 | IS | 18.02.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 18.10.2023 | |
HR | 18.10.2023 | ||
PL | 18.10.2023 | ||
RO | 18.10.2023 | ||
RS | 18.10.2023 | ||
SM | 18.10.2023 | ||
NO | 18.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | HR | 18.10.2023 | |
PL | 18.10.2023 | ||
RS | 18.10.2023 | ||
SM | 18.10.2023 | ||
NO | 18.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | HR | 18.10.2023 | |
PL | 18.10.2023 | ||
RS | 18.10.2023 | ||
NO | 18.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | IS | 18.02.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4158356 (WININGER DAVID V) [A] 1-19* the whole document *; | [A]US4159710 (PRAST GIJSBERT) [A] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [A]US4198954 (MEIJER ROELF J [NL]) [A] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [A]US4211212 (BRAUN RAYMOND J [US]) [A] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [IY]EP0059690 (FIAT RICERCHE [IT]) [I] 1-9,11-19 * page 4, line 25 - page 5, line 21; figures 1-5 * * page 8, line 7 - page 9, line 38; figures 1-5 * * page 6, line 7 - line 19; figure 5 * * figures 2,4 * [Y] 10; | [A]GR1003941 (TSIMERIKAS IOANNIS, et al) [A] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2013327400 (CASELLES FORNES JAIME [ES]) [Y] 10 * paragraph [0062]; figure 5 * | International search | [A]US4027651 (ROBBINS JR ROLAND W) [A] 16 * , the whole document. *; | [A]US4306541 (MORRISON CLAYTON, et al) [A] 16 * , column 4, lines 11 - 27; figure 6. *; | [A]US4352350 (JOHNSON CARL W) [A] 16 * , column 5, line 44 - column 6, line 40; figure 5. *; | [A]US2011100354 (FENG YEN-JUNG [TW], et al) [A] 16* , the whole document. *; | [A]US2013327400 (CASELLES FORNES JAIME [ES]) [A] 16 * , paragraphs [51- 60, 65]; figures 5, 7, 10. * |