EP3779483 - ENERGY STORAGE DEVICE CHARGING STATE FIBER ONLINE MONITORING SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.03.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.03.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.04.2023 [2023/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jinan University No. 601 Huangpu Avenue West Tianhe District Guangzhou Guangdong 510632 / CN | [2021/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUO, Tuan No. 601, Huangpu Avenue West Tianhe District Guangzhou Guangdong 510632 / CN | 02 /
MAI, Wenjie No. 601, Huangpu Avenue West Tianhe District Guangzhou Guangdong 510632 / CN | 03 /
LAO, Jiajie No. 601, Huangpu Avenue West Tianhe District Guangzhou Guangdong 510632 / CN | 04 /
SUN, Peng No. 601, Huangpu Avenue West Tianhe District Guangzhou Guangdong 510632 / CN | [2021/07] | Representative(s) | Mozzi, Matteo Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via Senato, 8 20121 Milano / IT | [2021/07] | Application number, filing date | 18914084.1 | 12.06.2018 | [2021/07] | WO2018CN90809 | Priority number, date | CN201810325936 | 12.04.2018 Original published format: CN201810325936 | [2021/07] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019196193 | Date: | 17.10.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3779483 | Date: | 17.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 17.10.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/36, H02J7/00, G01D5/38, G01R31/382, G02B6/02, H01M10/48, G01R31/64, H01G11/00 | [2022/18] | CPC: |
H02J7/0048 (EP,CN,US);
G01N27/305 (CN);
G01D5/35316 (EP);
G01N27/307 (CN);
G01N27/416 (CN);
G01N27/4163 (CN);
G01N27/48 (CN);
G01R31/3644 (EP,US);
G01R31/382 (EP,US);
G01R31/64 (EP);
G02B6/02085 (EP,US);
G02B6/02133 (EP);
H01G11/08 (EP);
H01G11/14 (EP);
H02J2207/50 (EP);
Y02E60/13 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/07] | G01R31/36, H02J7/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/07] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR ONLINE-ÜBERWACHUNG DES LADUNGSZUSTANDS VON FASERN EINER ENERGIESPEICHERVORRICHTUNG | [2021/07] | English: | ENERGY STORAGE DEVICE CHARGING STATE FIBER ONLINE MONITORING SYSTEM AND METHOD | [2021/07] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE CONTRÔLE EN LIGNE À FIBRE D'ÉTAT DE CHARGE DE DISPOSITIF DE STOCKAGE D'ÉNERGIE | [2021/07] | Entry into regional phase | 10.11.2020 | Translation filed | 10.11.2020 | National basic fee paid | 10.11.2020 | Search fee paid | 10.11.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.11.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/07] | 11.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.11.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/16] | 29.11.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2021 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   28.09.2021 | 30.06.2022 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CN101871886 (UNIV JILIANG CHINA) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2014092375 (RAGHAVAN AJAY [US], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0068]; figures 11, 12 *; | [A]CN204215026U (UNIV WENZHOU) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]CN105784811 (UNIV JINAN) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]CN107004913 (INSPLORION AB) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2018074128 (WANG SHUOQIN [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0003] , [0004] , [0014] , [0015] , [0019] - [0021]; figure 2A * | International search | [A]CN200993672Y (CHONGQING ENGINEERING COLLEGE [CN]) [A] 1-10 * entire document *; | [A]CN101871886 (UNIV JILIANG CHINA) [A] 1-10* entire document *; | [A]CN103713208 (PALO ALTO RES CT INC) [A] 1-10 * entire document *; | [A]CN204215026U (UNIV WENZHOU) [A] 1-10 * entire document *; | [X]CN105784811 (UNIV JINAN) [X] 1-10 * claims 1-10, description, paragraphs [0044]-[0058], and figures 1-2 *; | [A]CN105841843 (NIU POWER NEW ENERGY TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * entire document *; | [A]CN107817012 (GM GLOBAL TECH OPERATIONS LLC) [A] 1-10 * entire document * |