EP3650874 - TRANSFORMER SIMULATION SYSTEM AND SETTING VALUE SIMULATION MEASUREMENT METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.12.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.01.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.09.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.09.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.04.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.03.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 23.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Guangzhou Power Supply Co. Ltd. No. 2 Nan Er Rd. Tianhe Guangzhou Guangdong 510620 / CN | [2023/07] |
Former [2020/20] | For all designated states Guangzhou Power Supply Co. Ltd. No. 2 Nan Er Rd. Tianhe Guangzhou Guangdong 510620 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MO, Wenxiong No.2 Tianhe Nan Er Road Tianhe District Guangzhou, Guangdong 510620 / CN | 02 /
WANG, Yong No.2 Tianhe Nan Er Road Tianhe District Guangzhou, Guangdong 510620 / CN | 03 /
HUANG, Qingdan No.2 Tianhe Nan Er Road Tianhe District Guangzhou, Guangdong 510620 / CN | 04 /
SONG, Haoyong No.2 Tianhe Nan Er Road Tianhe District Guangzhou, Guangdong 510620 / CN | 05 /
CHEN, Yuging No.2 Tianhe Nan Er Road Tianhe District Guangzhou, Guangdong 510620 / CN | 06 /
WANG, Wei No.2 Tianhe Nan Er Road Tianhe District Guangzhou, Guangdong 510620 / CN | 07 /
LI, Zhuya No.2 Tianhe Nan Er Road Tianhe District Guangzhou, Guangdong 510620 / CN | 08 /
ZHAO, Chongzhi No.2 Tianhe Nan Er Road Tianhe District Guangzhou, Guangdong 510620 / CN | 09 /
LIU, Jing No.2 Tianhe Nan Er Road Tianhe District Guangzhou, Guangdong 510620 / CN | 10 /
PEI, Jiqiang No.2 Tianhe Nan Er Road Tianhe District Guangzhou, Guangdong 510620 / CN | 11 /
ZHANG, Yaru No.2 Tianhe Nan Er Road Tianhe District Guangzhou, Guangdong 510620 / CN | 12 /
HE, Binbin No.2 Tianhe Nan Er Road Tianhe District Guangzhou, Guangdong 510620 / CN | 13 /
WU, Peiwei No.2 Tianhe Nan Er Road Tianhe District Guangzhou, Guangdong 510620 / CN | 14 /
XU, Qin No.2 Tianhe Nan Er Road Tianhe District Guangzhou, Guangdong 510620 / CN | 15 /
ZENG, Hui No.2 Tianhe Nan Er Road Tianhe District Guangzhou, Guangdong 510620 / CN | [2023/07] |
Former [2020/20] | 01 /
MO, Wenxiong No.2 Tianhe Nan Er Road. Tianhe District Guangzhou Guangdong 510620 / CN | ||
02 /
WANG, Yong No.2 Tianhe Nan Er Road. Tianhe District Guangzhou Guangdong 510620 / CN | |||
03 /
HUANG, Qingdan No.2 Tianhe Nan Er Road. Tianhe District Guangzhou Guangdong 510620 / CN | |||
04 /
SONG, Haoyong No.2 Tianhe Nan Er Road. Tianhe District Guangzhou Guangdong 510620 / CN | |||
05 /
CHEN, Yuging No.2 Tianhe Nan Er Road. Tianhe District Guangzhou Guangdong 510620 / CN | |||
06 /
WANG, Wei No.2 Tianhe Nan Er Road. Tianhe District Guangzhou Guangdong 510620 / CN | |||
07 /
LI, Zhuya No.2 Tianhe Nan Er Road. Tianhe District Guangzhou Guangdong 510620 / CN | |||
08 /
ZHAO, Chongzhi No.2 Tianhe Nan Er Road. Tianhe District Guangzhou Guangdong 510620 / CN | |||
09 /
LIU, Jing No.2 Tianhe Nan Er Road. Tianhe District Guangzhou Guangdong 510620 / CN | |||
10 /
PEI, Jiqiang No.2 Tianhe Nan Er Road. Tianhe District Guangzhou Guangdong 510620 / CN | |||
11 /
ZHANG, Yaru No.2 Tianhe Nan Er Road. Tianhe District Guangzhou Guangdong 510620 / CN | |||
12 /
HE, Binbin No.2 Tianhe Nan Er Road. Tianhe District Guangzhou Guangdong 510620 / CN | |||
13 /
WU, Peiwei No.2 Tianhe Nan Er Road. Tianhe District Guangzhou Guangdong 510620 / CN | |||
14 /
XU, Qin No.2 Tianhe Nan Er Road. Tianhe District Guangzhou Guangdong 510620 / CN | |||
15 /
ZENG, Hui No.2 Tianhe Nan Er Road. Tianhe District Guangzhou Guangdong 510620 / CN | Representative(s) | Schulz Junghans Patentanwälte PartGmbB Großbeerenstraße 71 10963 Berlin / DE | [2023/07] |
Former [2020/20] | Corradini, Corrado, et al Ing. C. Corradini & C. S.r.l. Via Dante Alighieri 4 42100 Reggio Emilia / IT | Application number, filing date | 18914931.3 | 30.09.2018 | [2020/20] | WO2018CN109164 | Priority number, date | CN20181168880 | 13.09.2018 Original published format: CN201811068880 | [2020/20] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020051961 | Date: | 19.03.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3650874 | Date: | 13.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3650874 | Date: | 15.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 19.03.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/327, G01N33/28, G01M15/00, H02H6/00 | [2020/20] | CPC: |
G01N33/2841 (EP,US);
G01R31/3278 (CN);
H02H7/04 (US);
G01F1/00 (US);
H02H6/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/20] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR TRANSFORMATORSIMULATION UND VERFAHREN ZUR MESSUNG EINER EINSTELLWERTSIMULATION | [2020/20] | English: | TRANSFORMER SIMULATION SYSTEM AND SETTING VALUE SIMULATION MEASUREMENT METHOD | [2020/20] | French: | SYSTÈME DE SIMULATION DE TRANSFORMATEUR ET PROCÉDÉ DE MESURE DE SIMULATION DE VALEUR DE RÉGLAGE | [2020/20] | Entry into regional phase | 23.10.2019 | Translation filed | 23.10.2019 | National basic fee paid | 23.10.2019 | Search fee paid | 23.10.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.10.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.10.2019 | Examination requested [2020/20] | 12.10.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.09.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.09.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.12.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 29.12.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.12.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 16.11.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.02.2023 | CZ | 15.02.2023 | DK | 15.02.2023 | EE | 15.02.2023 | ES | 15.02.2023 | FI | 15.02.2023 | HR | 15.02.2023 | IT | 15.02.2023 | LT | 15.02.2023 | LV | 15.02.2023 | MC | 15.02.2023 | NL | 15.02.2023 | PL | 15.02.2023 | RO | 15.02.2023 | RS | 15.02.2023 | SE | 15.02.2023 | SI | 15.02.2023 | SK | 15.02.2023 | SM | 15.02.2023 | NO | 15.05.2023 | GR | 16.05.2023 | IS | 15.06.2023 | PT | 15.06.2023 | BE | 30.09.2023 | CH | 30.09.2023 | IE | 30.09.2023 | LU | 30.09.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/34] | AT | 15.02.2023 | |
CZ | 15.02.2023 | ||
DK | 15.02.2023 | ||
EE | 15.02.2023 | ||
ES | 15.02.2023 | ||
FI | 15.02.2023 | ||
HR | 15.02.2023 | ||
IT | 15.02.2023 | ||
LT | 15.02.2023 | ||
LV | 15.02.2023 | ||
MC | 15.02.2023 | ||
NL | 15.02.2023 | ||
PL | 15.02.2023 | ||
RO | 15.02.2023 | ||
RS | 15.02.2023 | ||
SE | 15.02.2023 | ||
SI | 15.02.2023 | ||
SK | 15.02.2023 | ||
SM | 15.02.2023 | ||
NO | 15.05.2023 | ||
GR | 16.05.2023 | ||
IS | 15.06.2023 | ||
PT | 15.06.2023 | ||
CH | 30.09.2023 | ||
IE | 30.09.2023 | ||
LU | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 15.02.2023 | |
CZ | 15.02.2023 | ||
DK | 15.02.2023 | ||
EE | 15.02.2023 | ||
ES | 15.02.2023 | ||
FI | 15.02.2023 | ||
HR | 15.02.2023 | ||
IT | 15.02.2023 | ||
LT | 15.02.2023 | ||
LV | 15.02.2023 | ||
MC | 15.02.2023 | ||
NL | 15.02.2023 | ||
PL | 15.02.2023 | ||
RO | 15.02.2023 | ||
RS | 15.02.2023 | ||
SE | 15.02.2023 | ||
SI | 15.02.2023 | ||
SK | 15.02.2023 | ||
SM | 15.02.2023 | ||
NO | 15.05.2023 | ||
GR | 16.05.2023 | ||
IS | 15.06.2023 | ||
PT | 15.06.2023 | ||
IE | 30.09.2023 | ||
LU | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/28] | AT | 15.02.2023 | |
CZ | 15.02.2023 | ||
DK | 15.02.2023 | ||
EE | 15.02.2023 | ||
ES | 15.02.2023 | ||
FI | 15.02.2023 | ||
HR | 15.02.2023 | ||
IT | 15.02.2023 | ||
LT | 15.02.2023 | ||
LV | 15.02.2023 | ||
MC | 15.02.2023 | ||
NL | 15.02.2023 | ||
PL | 15.02.2023 | ||
RO | 15.02.2023 | ||
RS | 15.02.2023 | ||
SE | 15.02.2023 | ||
SI | 15.02.2023 | ||
SK | 15.02.2023 | ||
SM | 15.02.2023 | ||
NO | 15.05.2023 | ||
GR | 16.05.2023 | ||
IS | 15.06.2023 | ||
PT | 15.06.2023 | ||
LU | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 15.02.2023 | |
CZ | 15.02.2023 | ||
DK | 15.02.2023 | ||
EE | 15.02.2023 | ||
ES | 15.02.2023 | ||
FI | 15.02.2023 | ||
HR | 15.02.2023 | ||
IT | 15.02.2023 | ||
LT | 15.02.2023 | ||
LV | 15.02.2023 | ||
NL | 15.02.2023 | ||
PL | 15.02.2023 | ||
RO | 15.02.2023 | ||
RS | 15.02.2023 | ||
SE | 15.02.2023 | ||
SI | 15.02.2023 | ||
SK | 15.02.2023 | ||
SM | 15.02.2023 | ||
NO | 15.05.2023 | ||
GR | 16.05.2023 | ||
IS | 15.06.2023 | ||
PT | 15.06.2023 | ||
LU | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 15.02.2023 | |
CZ | 15.02.2023 | ||
DK | 15.02.2023 | ||
EE | 15.02.2023 | ||
ES | 15.02.2023 | ||
FI | 15.02.2023 | ||
HR | 15.02.2023 | ||
LT | 15.02.2023 | ||
LV | 15.02.2023 | ||
NL | 15.02.2023 | ||
PL | 15.02.2023 | ||
RO | 15.02.2023 | ||
RS | 15.02.2023 | ||
SE | 15.02.2023 | ||
SI | 15.02.2023 | ||
SK | 15.02.2023 | ||
SM | 15.02.2023 | ||
NO | 15.05.2023 | ||
GR | 16.05.2023 | ||
IS | 15.06.2023 | ||
PT | 15.06.2023 | ||
LU | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/11] | AT | 15.02.2023 | |
CZ | 15.02.2023 | ||
DK | 15.02.2023 | ||
EE | 15.02.2023 | ||
ES | 15.02.2023 | ||
FI | 15.02.2023 | ||
HR | 15.02.2023 | ||
LT | 15.02.2023 | ||
LV | 15.02.2023 | ||
NL | 15.02.2023 | ||
PL | 15.02.2023 | ||
RO | 15.02.2023 | ||
RS | 15.02.2023 | ||
SE | 15.02.2023 | ||
SI | 15.02.2023 | ||
SK | 15.02.2023 | ||
SM | 15.02.2023 | ||
NO | 15.05.2023 | ||
GR | 16.05.2023 | ||
IS | 15.06.2023 | ||
PT | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 15.02.2023 | |
CZ | 15.02.2023 | ||
DK | 15.02.2023 | ||
EE | 15.02.2023 | ||
ES | 15.02.2023 | ||
FI | 15.02.2023 | ||
HR | 15.02.2023 | ||
LT | 15.02.2023 | ||
LV | 15.02.2023 | ||
NL | 15.02.2023 | ||
PL | 15.02.2023 | ||
RO | 15.02.2023 | ||
RS | 15.02.2023 | ||
SE | 15.02.2023 | ||
SK | 15.02.2023 | ||
SM | 15.02.2023 | ||
NO | 15.05.2023 | ||
GR | 16.05.2023 | ||
IS | 15.06.2023 | ||
PT | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 15.02.2023 | |
CZ | 15.02.2023 | ||
DK | 15.02.2023 | ||
EE | 15.02.2023 | ||
ES | 15.02.2023 | ||
FI | 15.02.2023 | ||
HR | 15.02.2023 | ||
LT | 15.02.2023 | ||
LV | 15.02.2023 | ||
NL | 15.02.2023 | ||
PL | 15.02.2023 | ||
RO | 15.02.2023 | ||
RS | 15.02.2023 | ||
SE | 15.02.2023 | ||
SM | 15.02.2023 | ||
NO | 15.05.2023 | ||
GR | 16.05.2023 | ||
IS | 15.06.2023 | ||
PT | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 15.02.2023 | |
DK | 15.02.2023 | ||
EE | 15.02.2023 | ||
ES | 15.02.2023 | ||
FI | 15.02.2023 | ||
HR | 15.02.2023 | ||
LT | 15.02.2023 | ||
LV | 15.02.2023 | ||
NL | 15.02.2023 | ||
PL | 15.02.2023 | ||
RS | 15.02.2023 | ||
SE | 15.02.2023 | ||
SM | 15.02.2023 | ||
NO | 15.05.2023 | ||
GR | 16.05.2023 | ||
IS | 15.06.2023 | ||
PT | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | AT | 15.02.2023 | |
DK | 15.02.2023 | ||
ES | 15.02.2023 | ||
FI | 15.02.2023 | ||
HR | 15.02.2023 | ||
LT | 15.02.2023 | ||
LV | 15.02.2023 | ||
NL | 15.02.2023 | ||
PL | 15.02.2023 | ||
RS | 15.02.2023 | ||
SE | 15.02.2023 | ||
SM | 15.02.2023 | ||
NO | 15.05.2023 | ||
GR | 16.05.2023 | ||
IS | 15.06.2023 | ||
PT | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | AT | 15.02.2023 | |
ES | 15.02.2023 | ||
FI | 15.02.2023 | ||
HR | 15.02.2023 | ||
LT | 15.02.2023 | ||
LV | 15.02.2023 | ||
NL | 15.02.2023 | ||
PL | 15.02.2023 | ||
RS | 15.02.2023 | ||
SE | 15.02.2023 | ||
NO | 15.05.2023 | ||
GR | 16.05.2023 | ||
IS | 15.06.2023 | ||
PT | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AT | 15.02.2023 | |
ES | 15.02.2023 | ||
FI | 15.02.2023 | ||
HR | 15.02.2023 | ||
LT | 15.02.2023 | ||
LV | 15.02.2023 | ||
NL | 15.02.2023 | ||
PL | 15.02.2023 | ||
RS | 15.02.2023 | ||
SE | 15.02.2023 | ||
NO | 15.05.2023 | ||
GR | 16.05.2023 | ||
PT | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AT | 15.02.2023 | |
ES | 15.02.2023 | ||
FI | 15.02.2023 | ||
HR | 15.02.2023 | ||
LT | 15.02.2023 | ||
LV | 15.02.2023 | ||
NL | 15.02.2023 | ||
RS | 15.02.2023 | ||
SE | 15.02.2023 | ||
NO | 15.05.2023 | ||
GR | 16.05.2023 | ||
PT | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | AT | 15.02.2023 | |
ES | 15.02.2023 | ||
FI | 15.02.2023 | ||
HR | 15.02.2023 | ||
LT | 15.02.2023 | ||
LV | 15.02.2023 | ||
NL | 15.02.2023 | ||
RS | 15.02.2023 | ||
SE | 15.02.2023 | ||
NO | 15.05.2023 | ||
PT | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 15.02.2023 | |
ES | 15.02.2023 | ||
HR | 15.02.2023 | ||
LT | 15.02.2023 | ||
NL | 15.02.2023 | ||
RS | 15.02.2023 | ||
NO | 15.05.2023 | ||
PT | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | ES | 15.02.2023 | |
LT | 15.02.2023 | ||
RS | 15.02.2023 | ||
PT | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | ES | 15.02.2023 | |
LT | 15.02.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]CN102889906B (RAN ZHENGHUA) [Y] 2-7* the whole document *; | [IY]CN108375727 (TECH INFORMATION CENTER OF SPIC HENAN ELECTRIC POWER CO LTD) [I] 1,8-10 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0092] * * figure 1 * [Y] 2-7 |