EP3783788 - METHOD FOR CONTROLLING RESONANT POWER CONVERSION DEVICE, AND RESONANT POWER CONVERSION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.04.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.02.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.09.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.01.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD. 2 Takara-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP | For all designated states Renault s.a.s 122-122 bis avenue du Général Leclerc 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | [2022/30] |
Former [2022/09] | For all designated states NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD. 2 Takara-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP | ||
For all designated states Renault s.a.s 13/15, quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | |||
Former [2021/08] | For all designated states NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD. 2 Takara-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP | ||
For all designated states Renault S.A.S. 13-15 quai Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAI, Toshihiro c/o NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD. Intellectual Property Department 1-1, Morinosatoaoyama Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP | 02 /
SAITO, Kousuke c/o NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD. Intellectual Property Department 1-1, Morinosatoaoyama Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP | 03 /
YAMAGAMI, Shigeharu c/o NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD. Intellectual Property Department 1-1, Morinosatoaoyama Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP | 04 /
INOUE, Keisuke c/o NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD. Intellectual Property Department 1-1, Morinosatoaoyama Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP | 05 /
THRONGNUMCHAI, Kraisorn c/o NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD. Intellectual Property Department 1-1, Morinosatoaoyama Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP | [2021/08] | Representative(s) | Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Pilgersheimer Straße 20 81543 München / DE | [2021/08] | Application number, filing date | 18914971.9 | 20.04.2018 | [2021/08] | WO2018IB00570 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019202354 | Date: | 24.10.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3783788 | Date: | 24.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3783788 | Date: | 10.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 24.10.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H02M7/48, H02M1/32, H03F3/217 | [2023/08] | CPC: |
H02M1/32 (EP,US);
H02M1/08 (US);
H02M7/48 (EP);
H02M7/537 (US);
H03F3/2176 (EP);
H02M1/0058 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2021/18] | H02M7/48, H02M1/32 | ||
Former IPC [2021/08] | H02M7/48 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/08] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG EINES RESONANZLEISTUNGSWANDLERS UND RESONANZLEISTUNGSWANDLER | [2021/08] | English: | METHOD FOR CONTROLLING RESONANT POWER CONVERSION DEVICE, AND RESONANT POWER CONVERSION DEVICE | [2021/08] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE DISPOSITIF DE CONVERSION DE PUISSANCE RÉSONNANT ET DISPOSITIF DE CONVERSION DE PUISSANCE RÉSONNANT | [2021/08] | Entry into regional phase | 12.10.2020 | Translation filed | 12.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 12.10.2020 | Search fee paid | 12.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/08] | 19.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.09.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.01.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.03.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 14.03.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.03.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 13.02.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.05.2023 | CZ | 10.05.2023 | DK | 10.05.2023 | EE | 10.05.2023 | ES | 10.05.2023 | FI | 10.05.2023 | HR | 10.05.2023 | IT | 10.05.2023 | LT | 10.05.2023 | LV | 10.05.2023 | NL | 10.05.2023 | PL | 10.05.2023 | RO | 10.05.2023 | RS | 10.05.2023 | SE | 10.05.2023 | SI | 10.05.2023 | SK | 10.05.2023 | SM | 10.05.2023 | NO | 10.08.2023 | GR | 11.08.2023 | IS | 10.09.2023 | PT | 11.09.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/25] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
CZ | 10.05.2023 | ||
DK | 10.05.2023 | ||
EE | 10.05.2023 | ||
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
FI | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RO | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
SI | 10.05.2023 | ||
SK | 10.05.2023 | ||
SM | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
CZ | 10.05.2023 | ||
DK | 10.05.2023 | ||
EE | 10.05.2023 | ||
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
FI | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RO | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
SK | 10.05.2023 | ||
SM | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
FI | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
SK | 10.05.2023 | ||
SM | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
FI | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 10.05.2023 | |
PT | 11.09.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2001019490 (IGARASHI SEIKI [JP], et al); | [A]US9024691 (BANERJEE ARITRA [US], et al) | International search | [A]JPH07142937 (MORI SHINSAKU); | [A]JPH08149836 (MINEBEA CO LTD); | [A]JP2003504906 ; | [A]JP2013030973 (NIPPON SOKEN, et al) | by applicant | JP2011101408 |