EP3788705 - CONTROL METHOD FOR PROTECTING SWITCHING DEVICES IN POWER CONVERTERS IN DOUBLY FED INDUCTION GENERATOR POWER SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.09.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.06.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.02.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.02.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.09.2024 | Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Renovables España, S.L. Calle Roc Boronat 78 08005 Barcelona / ES | [2023/50] |
Former [2021/10] | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WAGONER, Robert Gregory 1501 Roanoke Boulevard Salem, VA 24153 / US | 02 /
HOLLIDAY, Cornelius Edward, III 1501 Roanoke Blvd Salem, VA 24153 / US | [2021/10] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | [2021/10] | Application number, filing date | 18917462.6 | 04.05.2018 | [2021/10] | WO2018US31091 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019212563 | Date: | 07.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3788705 | Date: | 10.03.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.11.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 07.11.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H02M1/32, H02M7/5387, H02P9/00, H02J3/38, H02H3/16, H02H7/12 | [2021/48] | CPC: |
H02M1/32 (EP);
H02M1/322 (EP);
H02M7/5387 (EP);
H02P9/007 (EP);
H02J3/38 (EP);
H02M5/4585 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2021/10] | H02M1/32, H02M7/5387, H02J3/38 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/10] | Title | German: | STEUERUNGSVERFAHREN ZUM SCHUTZ VON SCHALTVORRICHTUNGEN IN STROMRICHTERN IN DOPPELT GESPEISTEN INDUKTIONSGENERATORLEISTUNGSSYSTEMEN | [2021/10] | English: | CONTROL METHOD FOR PROTECTING SWITCHING DEVICES IN POWER CONVERTERS IN DOUBLY FED INDUCTION GENERATOR POWER SYSTEMS | [2021/10] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE POUR PROTÉGER DES DISPOSITIFS DE COMMUTATION DANS DES CONVERTISSEURS DE PUISSANCE DANS DES SYSTÈMES D'ALIMENTATION DE GÉNÉRATEUR À INDUCTION À DOUBLE ALIMENTATION | [2021/10] | Entry into regional phase | 04.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 04.12.2020 | Search fee paid | 04.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/10] | 12.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.09.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2003151259 (FEDDERSEN LORENZ [DE], et al) [Y] 1,13 * figures 1,2,4 *; | [Y]EP2320549 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 1,7-15 * paragraphs [0035] , [0038]; figures 1-6 *; | [Y]EP2338224 (WOODWARD SEG GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [Y] 1,4-6,13 * paragraphs [0042] - [0044]; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]US2015155809 (GUPTA AMIT KUMAR [SG], et al) [Y] 4-6 * paragraph [0058]; figures 2-4 *; | [Y]CN106451470 (UNIV SHANGHAI ELECTRIC POWER) [Y] 7-12,14,15 * abstract *; | [Y]US2017272014 (REN WEI [US], et al) [Y] 7-12,14,15* paragraph [0051]; figures 2,4,7 *; | [XY] - JIN YANG ET AL, "A new converter protection scheme for doubly-fed induction generators during disturbances", INDUSTRIAL ELECTRONICS, 2008. IECON 2008. 34TH ANNUAL CONFERENCE OF IEEE, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20081110), ISBN 978-1-4244-1767-4, pages 2100 - 2105, XP031825739 [X] 1-3 * Section III. CONVERTER PROTECTION SCHEME, Subsection A. Converter Characteristics; Subsection E. Converter Protection Scheme; Subsection V.A. Simulation System; Subsection V.B. Simulation Results; figures 4,5 * [Y] 4-15 | [Y] - MEENAKSHI R ET AL, "Doubly fed induction generator for wind energy conversion system - A survey", ENERGY EFFICIENT TECHNOLOGIES FOR SUSTAINABILITY (ICEETS), 2013 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, doi:10.1109/ICEETS.2013.6533456, ISBN 978-1-4673-6149-1, (20130410), pages 617 - 628, (20130614), XP032679638 [Y] 1,13 * Section VI. USE OF CROWBAR SWITCH; figure 10 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICEETS.2013.6533456 | International search | [Y]US2007132248 (WENG HAIQING [CN], et al) [Y] 8-11,15-16 * See paragraphs 16-22 and figures 1-3. *; | [A]JP2007195315 (FUKUOKA INST TECHNOLOGY, et al) [A] 1-20* See the entire document. *; | [AX]US2011210553 (ENGELHARDT STEPHAN [DE], et al) [A] 2-6,17-20 * See paragraphs 28-50 and figures 1-2. * [X] 1,7,12-14; | [A]KR20110100692 (AJOU UNIV IND ACAD COOP FOUND [KR]) [A] 1-20 * See the entire document. *; | [A]US2014070535 (WAGONER ROBERT GREGORY [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * See the entire document. * |