EP3756709 - INTEGRATED SEALED MICRO-MESH NEBULIZING MODULE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.01.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.09.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.11.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Feellife Health INC. Room 2501, 1903, 2002, Building A No.9 Furong Road Tantou Community Songgang Street, Bao'an District Shenzhen / CN | [2024/08] |
Former [2024/06] | For all designated states Feellife Health INC. Room 2501, 1903, 2002, Building A No.9 Furong Road Tantou Community Songgang Street, Bao'an District Shenzhen / CN | ||
Former [2021/01] | For all designated states Hua, Jian West Block 2F 007 Dashi Building Keji Nansan Road Yuehai Street Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518000 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SONG, Xuefeng West Block, 2F, 007 Dashi Building Keji Nansan Rd. Yuehai Street, Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518000 / CN | 02 /
HUA, Jian West Block, 2F, 007 Dashi Building Keji Nansan Rd. Yuehai Street, Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518000 / CN | [2021/01] | Representative(s) | Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | [2021/01] | Application number, filing date | 18918743.8 | 26.06.2018 | [2021/01] | WO2018CN92923 | Priority number, date | CN201820743644U | 18.05.2018 Original published format: CN 201820743644 U | [2021/01] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019218428 | Date: | 21.11.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3756709 | Date: | 30.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/53] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3756709 | Date: | 21.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 21.11.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B05B17/00, A61M11/00, A61M15/00 | [2021/46] | CPC: |
A61M11/005 (EP,US);
A61M15/0085 (EP);
B05B17/0646 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2021/01] | A61M11/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERNEBLUNGSMODUL MIT INTEGRIERTEM VERSIEGELTEM FEINMASCHIGEM GITTER | [2021/01] | English: | INTEGRATED SEALED MICRO-MESH NEBULIZING MODULE | [2021/01] | French: | MODULE DE NÉBULISATION À MICRO-MAILLES SCELLÉ DE MANIÈRE ÉTANCHE, INTÉGRÉ | [2021/01] | Entry into regional phase | 06.08.2020 | Translation filed | 06.08.2020 | National basic fee paid | 06.08.2020 | Search fee paid | 06.08.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.08.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.08.2020 | Examination requested [2020/53] | 10.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 11.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.02.2024 | BG | 21.02.2024 | ES | 21.02.2024 | FI | 21.02.2024 | HR | 21.02.2024 | LT | 21.02.2024 | LV | 21.02.2024 | NL | 21.02.2024 | SE | 21.02.2024 | NO | 21.05.2024 | RS | 21.05.2024 | GR | 22.05.2024 | IS | 21.06.2024 | PT | 21.06.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 21.02.2024 | |
BG | 21.02.2024 | ||
ES | 21.02.2024 | ||
FI | 21.02.2024 | ||
HR | 21.02.2024 | ||
LT | 21.02.2024 | ||
LV | 21.02.2024 | ||
NL | 21.02.2024 | ||
NO | 21.05.2024 | ||
RS | 21.05.2024 | ||
GR | 22.05.2024 | ||
IS | 21.06.2024 | ||
PT | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 21.02.2024 | |
BG | 21.02.2024 | ||
ES | 21.02.2024 | ||
FI | 21.02.2024 | ||
HR | 21.02.2024 | ||
LT | 21.02.2024 | ||
NL | 21.02.2024 | ||
NO | 21.05.2024 | ||
RS | 21.05.2024 | ||
GR | 22.05.2024 | ||
IS | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 21.02.2024 | |
FI | 21.02.2024 | ||
HR | 21.02.2024 | ||
LT | 21.02.2024 | ||
NL | 21.02.2024 | ||
NO | 21.05.2024 | ||
RS | 21.05.2024 | ||
GR | 22.05.2024 | ||
IS | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 21.02.2024 | |
NO | 21.05.2024 | ||
IS | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 21.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2006207591 (GALLEM THOMAS [DE], et al); | [YA]US2007267010 (FINK JAMES B [US], et al); | [A]US2015102124 (HU CHIN CHIEN [TW], et al); | [Y]US2015238993 (HSIEH SHU-PIN [TW], et al); | [A]US2015306334 (GALLEM THOMAS [DE], et al); | [XAI]CN205181935U (XIAMEN VOKE HEALTH TECH CO LTD) | International search | [A]US2005081844 (GRYCHOWSKI JERRY [US], et al); | [A]CN105311718 (HCMED INNOVATIONS CO LTD); | [A]CN205198623U (DELTA ELECTRONICS INC); | [A]CN106178202 (CIXI SHUNYE MEDICAL EQUIPMENT CO LTD); | [A]CN206934411U (SHENZHEN DEDA ELECTRICAL APPLIANCE CO LTD) |