EP3803599 - ERASURE CODING WITH OVERLAPPED LOCAL RECONSTRUCTION CODES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.03.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | [2021/45] |
Former [2021/15] | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond WA 98052-7329 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHU, Jianfeng c/o Microsoft Asia Pacific R&D Headquarters 14F, Building 2, No. 5, Danling Street Haidian District Beijing 100080 / CN | 02 /
TAO, Yiheng c/o Microsoft Asia Pacific R&D Headquarters 14F, Building 2, No. 5, Danling Street Haidian District Beijing 100080 / CN | 03 /
HUANG, Cheng c/o Microsoft Corporation One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | 04 /
OGUS, Aaron William c/o Microsoft Corporation One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | 05 /
ZHAO, Yilong c/o Microsoft Asia Pacific R&D Headquarters 14F, Building 2, No. 5, Danling Street Haidian District Beijing 100080 / CN | 06 /
CHEN, Terry c/o Microsoft Asia Pacific R&D Headquarters 14F, Building 2, No. 5, Danling Street Haidian District Beijing 100080 / CN | 07 /
YU, Zhenshan c/o Microsoft Asia Pacific R&D Headquarters 14F, Building 2, No. 5, Danling Street Haidian District Beijing 100080 / CN | 08 /
SHAH, Tejas c/o Microsoft Corporation One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | 09 /
SRINIVASAN, Sridhar c/o Microsoft Asia Pacific R&D Headquarters 14F, Building 2, No. 5, Danling Street Haidian District Beijing 100080 / CN | [2021/37] |
Former [2021/15] | 01 /
ZHU, Jianfeng c/o Microsoft Asia Pacific R&D Headquarters 14F Building 2, No. 5, Danling Street, Haidian District Beijing 100080 / CN | ||
02 /
TAO, Yiheng c/o Microsoft Asia Pacific R&D Headquarters 14F Building 2, No. 5, Danling Street, Haidian District Beijing 100080 / CN | |||
03 /
HUANG, Cheng c/o Microsoft Corporation One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | |||
04 /
OGUS, Aaron William c/o Microsoft Corporation, One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA Washington 98052 / US | |||
05 /
ZHAO, Yilong c/o Microsoft Asia Pacific R&D Headquarters 14F Building 2, No. 5, Danling Street, Haidian District Beijing 100080 / CN | |||
06 /
CHEN, Terry c/o Microsoft Asia Pacific R&D Headquarters 14F Building 2, No. 5, Danling Street, Haidian District Beijing 100080 / CN | |||
07 /
YU, Zhenshan c/o Microsoft Asia Pacific R&D Headquarters 14F Building 2, No. 5, Danling Street, Haidian District Beijing 100080 / CN | |||
08 /
SHAH, Tejas c/o Microsoft Corporation One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | |||
09 /
SRINIVASAN, Sridhar c/o Microsoft Asia Pacific R&D Headquarters 14F Building 2, No. 5, Danling Street, Haidian District Beijing 100080 / CN | Representative(s) | CMS Cameron McKenna Nabarro Olswang LLP Cannon Place 78 Cannon Street London EC4N 6AF / GB | [2021/15] | Application number, filing date | 18920511.5 | 01.06.2018 | [2021/15] | WO2018CN89534 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019227465 | Date: | 05.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3803599 | Date: | 14.04.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.12.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 05.12.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06F11/10 | [2021/15] | CPC: |
G06F11/1076 (EP);
G06F3/064 (US);
G06F11/1004 (US);
G06F11/1012 (EP);
G06F3/067 (US);
H03M13/373 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/15] | Title | German: | LÖSCHCODIERUNG MIT ÜBERLAPPENDEN LOKALEN REKONSTRUKTIONSCODES | [2021/15] | English: | ERASURE CODING WITH OVERLAPPED LOCAL RECONSTRUCTION CODES | [2021/15] | French: | CODAGE À EFFACEMENT AVEC CODES DE RECONSTRUCTION LOCALE À CHEVAUCHEMENT | [2021/15] | Entry into regional phase | 19.11.2020 | National basic fee paid | 19.11.2020 | Search fee paid | 19.11.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.11.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/15] | 17.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2014380126 (YEKHANIN SERGEY [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0126] - [0134]; figures 2,4-6 *; | [X]US2014380125 (CALDER BRADLEY G [US], et al) [X] 1-15* paragraphs [0073] - [0081]; figures 2, 4-6 * | International search | [A]US2014380126 (YEKHANIN SERGEY [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * description, paragraphs [0037]-[0048], claims 1-6 *; | [A]CN106294026 (INSPUR (BEIJING) ELECTRONIC INFORMATION IND CO LTD) [A] 1-20* the whole document *; | [A]US2017255510 (KAN HAI BIN [CN], et al) [A] 1-20 * the whole document * | by applicant | US2014380126 |