EP3785796 - METHOD FOR PREPARING HYDROCRACKING CATALYST [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.09.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.10.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.07.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.01.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.01.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sinochem Corporation 28 Fuxingmen Inner Street Xicheng District Beijing 100031 / CN | For all designated states Sinochem Quanzhou Petrochemical Co., Ltd Quanhui Petrochemical Industrial Zone Dongqiao Hui'an Quanzhuo, Fujian 362103 / CN | For all designated states Sinochem Quanzhou Energy Technology Co. Ltd Marine Fisheries Bureau No. 1 Fenghai Road Fengze District Quanzhou, Fujian 362100 / CN | [2021/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Changkun Marine Fisheries Bureau, No. 1 Fenghai Road, Fengze District Quanzhou, Fujian 362100 / CN | 02 /
FAN, Wenqing Marine Fisheries Bureau, No. 1 Fenghai Road, Fengze District Quanzhou, Fujian 362100 / CN | 03 /
WU, Jintian Marine Fisheries Bureau, No. 1 Fenghai Road, Fengze District Quanzhou, Fujian 362100 / CN | 04 /
ZHANG, Li Marine Fisheries Bureau, No. 1 Fenghai Road, Fengze District Quanzhou, Fujian 362100 / CN | [2021/09] | Representative(s) | Petculescu, Ana-Maria Bayramoglu Law Offices LLC Türkiye Irtibat Ofisi, Mira Office, Kanuni Sultan Süleyman Boulevard, 5387. street Beytepe, floor 12, no:50 06800 Cankaya, Ankara / TR | [2021/09] | Application number, filing date | 18921901.7 | 11.10.2018 | [2021/09] | WO2018CN109793 | Priority number, date | CN201810565360 | 04.06.2018 Original published format: CN201810565360 | [2021/09] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019233009 | Date: | 12.12.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3785796 | Date: | 03.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3785796 | Date: | 23.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 12.12.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B01J29/16, C10G47/20, B01J21/04, B01J21/12, B01J23/888, B01J29/08, B01J35/00, B01J37/00, B01J37/02 | [2021/31] | CPC: |
B01J37/0207 (EP,US);
B01J29/166 (CN,US);
B01J35/19 (US);
B01J21/04 (EP);
B01J21/12 (EP,US);
B01J23/28 (US);
B01J23/755 (US);
B01J23/888 (EP);
B01J29/084 (EP);
B01J35/30 (EP);
B01J37/0009 (EP);
B01J37/0018 (EP);
B01J37/0036 (EP);
B01J37/0203 (EP);
B01J37/0209 (EP);
B01J37/0236 (US);
C10G47/20 (EP,CN,US);
B01J21/16 (US);
B01J2229/186 (CN);
B01J2229/20 (EP);
B01J2229/32 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/09] | B01J29/16, C10G47/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES HYDROCRACKING-KATALSYSATORS | [2021/09] | English: | METHOD FOR PREPARING HYDROCRACKING CATALYST | [2021/09] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION D'UN CATALYSEUR D'HYDROCRAQUAGE | [2021/09] | Entry into regional phase | 24.11.2020 | Translation filed | 24.11.2020 | National basic fee paid | 24.11.2020 | Search fee paid | 24.11.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.11.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/09] | 29.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.01.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.10.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 12.10.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.10.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 24.08.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 23.11.2022 | AT | 23.11.2022 | CZ | 23.11.2022 | DK | 23.11.2022 | EE | 23.11.2022 | ES | 23.11.2022 | FI | 23.11.2022 | HR | 23.11.2022 | IT | 23.11.2022 | LT | 23.11.2022 | LV | 23.11.2022 | MC | 23.11.2022 | NL | 23.11.2022 | PL | 23.11.2022 | RO | 23.11.2022 | RS | 23.11.2022 | SE | 23.11.2022 | SI | 23.11.2022 | SK | 23.11.2022 | SM | 23.11.2022 | NO | 23.02.2023 | GR | 24.02.2023 | IS | 23.03.2023 | PT | 23.03.2023 | [2024/28] |
Former [2024/26] | AL | 23.11.2022 | |
AT | 23.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2022 | ||
DK | 23.11.2022 | ||
EE | 23.11.2022 | ||
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
IT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
NL | 23.11.2022 | ||
PL | 23.11.2022 | ||
RO | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
SE | 23.11.2022 | ||
SI | 23.11.2022 | ||
SK | 23.11.2022 | ||
SM | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 23.11.2022 | |
AT | 23.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2022 | ||
DK | 23.11.2022 | ||
EE | 23.11.2022 | ||
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
NL | 23.11.2022 | ||
PL | 23.11.2022 | ||
RO | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
SE | 23.11.2022 | ||
SI | 23.11.2022 | ||
SK | 23.11.2022 | ||
SM | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 23.11.2022 | |
AT | 23.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2022 | ||
DK | 23.11.2022 | ||
EE | 23.11.2022 | ||
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
NL | 23.11.2022 | ||
PL | 23.11.2022 | ||
RO | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
SE | 23.11.2022 | ||
SK | 23.11.2022 | ||
SM | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 23.11.2022 | |
AT | 23.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2022 | ||
DK | 23.11.2022 | ||
EE | 23.11.2022 | ||
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
NL | 23.11.2022 | ||
PL | 23.11.2022 | ||
RO | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
SE | 23.11.2022 | ||
SM | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 23.11.2022 | |
CZ | 23.11.2022 | ||
DK | 23.11.2022 | ||
EE | 23.11.2022 | ||
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
NL | 23.11.2022 | ||
PL | 23.11.2022 | ||
RO | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
SE | 23.11.2022 | ||
SM | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | AT | 23.11.2022 | |
DK | 23.11.2022 | ||
EE | 23.11.2022 | ||
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
NL | 23.11.2022 | ||
PL | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
SE | 23.11.2022 | ||
SM | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AT | 23.11.2022 | |
DK | 23.11.2022 | ||
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
NL | 23.11.2022 | ||
PL | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
SE | 23.11.2022 | ||
SM | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AT | 23.11.2022 | |
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
NL | 23.11.2022 | ||
PL | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
SE | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AT | 23.11.2022 | |
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
PL | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
SE | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 23.11.2022 | |
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
SE | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 23.11.2022 | |
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
SE | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 23.11.2022 | |
NO | 23.02.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]CN103447074 (CHINA NAT OFFSHORE OIL CORP, et al); |