EP3666936 - SEMI-INSULATING SILICON CARBIDE SINGLE CRYSTAL DOPED WITH SMALL AMOUNT OF VANADIUM, SUBSTRATE PREPARED THEREFROM, AND PREPARATION METHOD THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.12.2022 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.05.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.04.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SICC Co., Ltd Room 1106-6-01 Building AB Century Wealth Center West Side of Xinyu Road Innovation Zone Jinan Shandong 250100 / CN | [2020/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GAO, Chao AB Block 1106-6-01, century Fortune Center West Side of Xinyu, High-tech District Jinan, Shandong 250100 / CN | 02 /
LIU, Jiapeng AB Block 1106-6-01, century Fortune Center West Side of Xinyu, High-tech District Jinan, Shandong 250100 / CN | 03 /
LI, Jialin AB Block 1106-6-01, century Fortune Center West Side of Xinyu, High-tech District Jinan, Shandong 250100 / CN | 04 /
LI, Chanjin AB Block 1106-6-01, century Fortune Center West Side of Xinyu, High-tech District Jinan, Shandong 250100 / CN | 05 /
BAI, Wenwen AB Block 1106-6-01, century Fortune Center West Side of Xinyu, High-tech District Jinan, Shandong 250100 / CN | 06 /
ZONG, Yanmin AB Block 1106-6-01, century Fortune Center West Side of Xinyu, High-tech District Jinan, Shandong 250100 / CN | [2021/04] | Representative(s) | Huang, Liwei Cäcilienstraße 12 40597 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/25] | Bergenstråhle Group AB P.O. Box 17704 118 93 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 18922091.6 | 26.12.2018 | [2020/25] | WO2018CN123707 | Priority number, date | CN201811204690 | 16.10.2018 Original published format: CN201811204690 | CN201811204702 | 16.10.2018 Original published format: CN201811204702 | [2020/25] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020077846 | Date: | 23.04.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3666936 | Date: | 17.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 23.04.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C30B23/02, C30B29/36, C30B33/02, C30B35/00 | [2020/44] | CPC: |
C30B29/36 (EP,KR);
C30B23/02 (EP,KR);
C30B33/02 (EP,KR);
C30B35/002 (KR);
C30B35/007 (EP);
H01L21/02529 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2020/25] | C30B23/02, C30B29/36, C30B33/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/25] | Title | German: | MIT GERINGER VANADIUMMENGE DOTIERTER HALBISOLIERENDER SILICIUMCARBID-EINKRISTALL, SUBSTRAT UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN | [2020/25] | English: | SEMI-INSULATING SILICON CARBIDE SINGLE CRYSTAL DOPED WITH SMALL AMOUNT OF VANADIUM, SUBSTRATE PREPARED THEREFROM, AND PREPARATION METHOD THEREFOR | [2020/25] | French: | MONOCRISTAL DE CARBURE DE SILICIUM SEMI-ISOLANT DOPÉ AVEC UNE PETITE QUANTITÉ DE VANADIUM, SUBSTRAT PRÉPARÉ À PARTIR DE CELUI-CI, ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION | [2020/25] | Entry into regional phase | 18.12.2019 | Translation filed | 18.12.2019 | National basic fee paid | 18.12.2019 | Search fee paid | 18.12.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.12.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/25] | 26.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.04.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0071787 (CREE INC [US], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [XAI]CN102560671 (CHINESE ACAD PHYSICS INST) [X] 1,2,5-10,13-15 * paragraphs [0007] - [0017] - [0 24] - [0029] - [0 49] * * example 1 * * table 1 * * claims 2, 4, 7, 9, 15, 16 * [A] 3,4,12 [I] 11; | [A] - SON ET AL, "Prominent defects in semi-insulating SiC substrates", PHYSICA B: CONDENSED MATTER, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20071117), vol. 401-402, doi:10.1016/J.PHYSB.2007.08.115, ISSN 0921-4526, pages 67 - 72, XP022349820 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.physb.2007.08.115 |