EP3807486 - GESTURE ACCESS AND OBJECT IMPACT AVOIDANCE SYSTEM FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.11.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.03.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ADAC Plastics, Inc. 5920 Tahoe Drive SE Grand Rapids, MI 49546 / US | [2021/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BANTER, Charles B. 16330 Brooklane Boulevard Northville, MI 48168 / US | 02 /
BINGLE, Robert 3858 Woodstream Drive, S.W Grand Rapids, MI 49534 / US | 03 /
VADAS, Keith J. 5958 Sierra Ridge Drive Caledonia, MI 49546 / US | 04 /
FRENCH, Thomas M. 7195 Loma Linda Drive Rockford, MI 49341 / US | 05 /
BUSSIS, Ryan 1658 Sweet Grass Drive, S.E. Grand Rapids, MI 49316 / US | 06 /
ADAMCZYK, Anne 2231 Gaynor Avenue, N.W. Grand Rapids, MI 49544 / US | 07 /
JETTON, James 10 Straight Avenue, N.W. Grand Rapids, MI 49504 / US | [2021/16] | Representative(s) | Beyer, Andreas Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [2024/16] |
Former [2021/16] | Beyer, Andreas Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18922585.7 | 14.06.2018 | [2021/16] | WO2018US37517 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019240794 | Date: | 19.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3807486 | Date: | 21.04.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.12.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3807486 | Date: | 17.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 19.12.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | E05F15/73, G01J5/10, G01J5/00, E05B81/78, E05B81/76, E05B85/10, G08C23/04 | [2021/16] | CPC: |
G07C9/00309 (EP);
E05B81/76 (EP,CN);
E05B81/78 (EP,CN);
E05B85/16 (EP,CN);
E05F15/73 (EP,CN);
G01J5/00 (CN);
G01J5/10 (CN);
E05F2015/765 (EP,CN);
E05Y2201/68 (EP,CN);
E05Y2400/814 (EP);
E05Y2400/822 (EP);
E05Y2400/852 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GESTENZUGANGS- UND OBJEKTAUFPRALLVERMEIDUNGSSYSTEM FÜR EIN KRAFTFAHRZEUG | [2021/16] | English: | GESTURE ACCESS AND OBJECT IMPACT AVOIDANCE SYSTEM FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE | [2021/16] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ACCÈS PAR UN GESTE ET D'ÉVITEMENT D'IMPACT D'OBJET DESTINÉ À UN VÉHICULE À MOTEUR | [2021/16] | Entry into regional phase | 20.11.2020 | National basic fee paid | 20.11.2020 | Search fee paid | 20.11.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.11.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/16] | 23.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 11.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2014207344 (IHLENBURG JOERN [DE], et al) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0038] - [0051] - [0054] - [0057] - [0061] - [0063] * * figures 1-7,12-14; claims 1-4,14-19 *; | [A]US9470033 (DUDAR AED M [US]) [A] 1-15 * column 2, lines 28-56 * * column 3, line 16 - column 4, line 54 * * column 5, line 66 - column 6, line 61 ** figures 1-3; claims 1-4,8-11,15,16 *; | [XI]US2016357262 (ANSARI ARAFAT M A [US]) [X] 1,4,12,14,15 * paragraphs [0041] , [0057] - [0073] - [0086] , [0093] , [0109] - [0141] - [0158] - [0161] - [0219] - [0227] * * figures 2-6; claim 1 * [I] 2,3,5-11,13; | [X]US2017032599 (ELIE LARRY [US], et al) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0003] - [0005] - [0031] - [0037] - [0062] - [0071] * * figures 1-5,7,8; claims 1-3,9-11,15,16 * | International search | [A]US6086131 (BINGLE ROBERT L [US], et al) [A] 1-4,36-39,42-44,60-62,66,72,73 * See claims 1-20 and figures 1-5. *; | [A]US2011196568 (NICKOLAOU JAMES N [US], et al) [A] 1-4,36-39,42-44,60-62,66,72,73* See claims 1, 7-9, 11 and figures 1-3. *; | [AX]US2011309912 (MUELLER ULRICH [DE]) [A] 1-4,42-44,60-62,66,72,73 * See paragraphs [0070], [0072], [0076]-[0078], claims 1, 3, 6, 25, 27, and figures 1-3. * [X] 36-39; | [A]KR20120032145 (MANDO CORP [KR]) [A] 1-4,36-39,42-44,60-62,66,72,73 * See claims 1-4 and figures 1-3. *; | [A]US2015009062 (HERTHAN BERND [DE]) [A] 1-4,36-39,42-44,60-62,66,72,73 * See paragraphs [0038]-[0048] and figures 1-6. * | by applicant | US2012200486 | US2012312956 | US2014207344 | US2015069249 | US2015248796 | US2016357262 | US2017032599 |