EP3637057 - METHOD, DEVICE, SYSTEM AND STORAGE MEDIUM FOR STORING AND LOADING VISUAL POSITIONING MAP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.07.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.05.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.09.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.03.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.01.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 30.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Uisee Technologies (Beijing) Ltd Room 401 Building 2 No.85 Hongan Road Fangshan District Beijing 102402 / CN | [2020/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FENG, Wei 1/F, Building 1, No. 85 Hong'an Road Fangshan District Beijing 102402 / CN | 02 /
LIN, Wei 1/F, Building 1, No. 85 Hong'an Road Fangshan District Beijing 102402 / CN | 03 /
ZHANG, Dan 1/F, Building 1, No. 85 Hong'an Road Fangshan District Beijing 102402 / CN | 04 /
ZHOU, Xin 1/F, Building 1, No. 85 Hong'an Road Fangshan District Beijing 102402 / CN | [2020/16] | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [2020/16] | Application number, filing date | 18923757.1 | 19.07.2018 | [2020/16] | WO2018CN96313 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020014924 | Date: | 23.01.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3637057 | Date: | 15.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3637057 | Date: | 28.08.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 23.01.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G01C21/32, G01C21/00 | [2021/09] | CPC: |
G01C21/3874 (EP,KR,US);
G06F16/29 (EP,KR);
G01C21/005 (EP,KR);
G01C21/3811 (KR,US);
G01C21/3833 (EP,KR);
G01C21/3867 (EP,KR,US);
G06F18/23 (KR,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/16] | G01C21/32 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG, SYSTEM UND SPEICHERMEDIUM ZUM SPEICHERN UND LADEN EINER VISUELLEN POSITIONIERUNGSKARTE | [2020/16] | English: | METHOD, DEVICE, SYSTEM AND STORAGE MEDIUM FOR STORING AND LOADING VISUAL POSITIONING MAP | [2020/16] | French: | PROCÉDÉ, DISPOSITIF, SYSTÈME ET SUPPORT D'INFORMATIONS PERMETTANT LA MÉMORISATION ET LE CHARGEMENT D'UNE CARTE DE POSITIONNEMENT VISUEL | [2020/16] | Entry into regional phase | 30.12.2019 | Translation filed | 30.12.2019 | National basic fee paid | 30.12.2019 | Search fee paid | 30.12.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.12.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/16] | 01.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.08.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.01.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.04.2024 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 09.04.2024 | 09.04.2024 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 21.05.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.07.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 23.07.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.07.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2015043784 (FLINT ALEX [US], et al); | [XA]US2016379092 (KUTLIROFF GERSHOM [IL]) | International search | [A]CN104756155 (QUALCOMM INC); | [A]CN105869512 (BEIJING YUNJI TECH CO LTD); | [A]CN105869136 (BEIJING ROBOTLEO INTELLIGENT TECH CO LTD); | [A]CN106289285 (UNIV NANJING SCIENCE & TECH); | [A]CN106371445 (UNIV ZHEJIANG); | [A]CN107004028 (QUALCOMM INC); | [A]CN108256574 (GUANGDONG INST INTELLIGENT MFG) |