EP3817851 - AUTOMATED MODULAR SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PRODUCTION OF BIOPOLYMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.12.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.04.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Synthego Corporation 3696-A Haven Avenue Redwood City, California 94063 / US | [2024/19] |
Former [2021/19] | For all designated states Synthego Corporation 3696 Haven Avenue Redwood City, California 94063 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DABROWSKI, Paul 3696-A Haven Avenue Redwood City, California 94063 / US | 02 /
DABROWSKI, Michael 3696-A Haven Avenue Redwood City, California 94063 / US | 03 /
GERLINGHAUS, Fabian 3696-A Haven Avenue Redwood City, California 94063 / US | 04 /
PESCH, Alex 3696-A Haven Avenue Redwood City, California 94063 / US | [2021/19] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [2024/20] |
Former [2021/19] | J A Kemp LLP 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 18925404.8 | 05.07.2018 | [2021/19] | WO2018US40906 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020009700 | Date: | 09.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3817851 | Date: | 12.05.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.01.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3817851 | Date: | 15.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.01.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B01J19/24, B01J19/02, G05B19/418, B01J19/00 | [2022/09] | CPC: |
B25J21/005 (EP,GB);
B01J19/0046 (EP,GB);
B01J19/004 (EP);
B25J5/02 (EP,GB);
B25J9/0084 (EP,GB);
B01J2219/0031 (EP);
B01J2219/00351 (EP);
B01J2219/00621 (EP);
B01J2219/00686 (EP);
B01J2219/00689 (EP,GB);
B01J2219/00691 (EP,GB);
B01J2219/00693 (EP,GB);
|
Former IPC [2021/19] | B01J19/24, B01J19/02, G05B19/418 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/18] |
Former [2021/19] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUTOMATISIERTES MODULARES SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON BIOPOLYMEREN | [2021/19] | English: | AUTOMATED MODULAR SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PRODUCTION OF BIOPOLYMERS | [2021/19] | French: | SYSTÈME MODULAIRE AUTOMATISÉ ET PROCÉDÉ POUR LA PRODUCTION DE BIOPOLYMÈRES | [2021/19] | Entry into regional phase | 26.01.2021 | National basic fee paid | 26.01.2021 | Search fee paid | 26.01.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.01.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/19] | 07.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.12.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.04.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 03.04.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.04.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP24165454.0 / EP4364839 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2021 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   27.10.2021 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO8910188 (EUROP LAB MOLEKULARBIOLOG [DE]); | [Y]US5424186 (FODOR STEPHEN P A [US], et al); | [A]WO9810857 (CHIRON CORP [US]); | [A]WO0032308 (SYMYX TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al); | [Y]US2002143475 (OKAMURA NOBUYUKI [JP], et al); | [XI]US2003068621 (BRIGGS JONATHAN [US]); | [Y]GB2395484 (AGILENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]); | [XI]US2011311417 (LI MO-HUANG [SG], et al); | [A]US2018099261 (GUYETTE MICHEL [BE], et al) | International search | [Y]EP0688008 (LINTEC CORP [JP]); | [Y]US6168914 (CAMPBELL DAVID A [US], et al); | [Y]US2008026096 (ROZEMA HENRY J [CA], et al); | [XY]US2012022966 (RAAB DAVID [DE], et al) |