EP3823834 - PRINT SUBSTANCE OUTPUT ADJUSTMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.12.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.10.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.04.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P. 10300 Energy Drive Spring TX 77389 / US | [2021/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FASEN, Donald J. 11311 Chinden Blvd. Boise, Idaho 83714 / US | [2021/21] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2024/01] | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2021/21] | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 18926909.5 | 17.07.2018 | [2021/21] | WO2018US42437 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020018076 | Date: | 23.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3823834 | Date: | 26.05.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.01.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3823834 | Date: | 03.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 23.01.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B41F31/02, B41J2/175, G03G15/08, B41J2/195, B41J2/36, G06K15/02, B41F33/00 | [2022/06] | CPC: |
B41J2/195 (EP);
G03G15/0849 (EP,US);
B41F31/02 (US);
B41J2/175 (EP);
B41J2/17503 (EP,US);
B41J2/362 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/21] | B41F31/02, B41J2/175, G03G15/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EINSTELLUNGEN DER AUSGABE VON DRUCKSUBSTANZEN | [2021/21] | English: | PRINT SUBSTANCE OUTPUT ADJUSTMENTS | [2021/21] | French: | RÉGLAGES DE SORTIE DE SUBSTANCE D'IMPRESSION | [2021/21] | Entry into regional phase | 07.01.2021 | National basic fee paid | 07.01.2021 | Search fee paid | 07.01.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.01.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/21] | 14.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.11.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 28.11.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.11.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.01.2024 | BG | 03.01.2024 | CZ | 03.01.2024 | ES | 03.01.2024 | HR | 03.01.2024 | LT | 03.01.2024 | LV | 03.01.2024 | NL | 03.01.2024 | PL | 03.01.2024 | SE | 03.01.2024 | NO | 03.04.2024 | RS | 03.04.2024 | GR | 04.04.2024 | IS | 03.05.2024 | PT | 03.05.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 03.01.2024 | |
BG | 03.01.2024 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2024 | ||
ES | 03.01.2024 | ||
HR | 03.01.2024 | ||
LT | 03.01.2024 | ||
LV | 03.01.2024 | ||
NL | 03.01.2024 | ||
PL | 03.01.2024 | ||
NO | 03.04.2024 | ||
RS | 03.04.2024 | ||
GR | 04.04.2024 | ||
IS | 03.05.2024 | ||
PT | 03.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 03.01.2024 | |
BG | 03.01.2024 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2024 | ||
ES | 03.01.2024 | ||
HR | 03.01.2024 | ||
LT | 03.01.2024 | ||
NL | 03.01.2024 | ||
NO | 03.04.2024 | ||
RS | 03.04.2024 | ||
GR | 04.04.2024 | ||
IS | 03.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 03.01.2024 | |
ES | 03.01.2024 | ||
HR | 03.01.2024 | ||
LT | 03.01.2024 | ||
NL | 03.01.2024 | ||
NO | 03.04.2024 | ||
RS | 03.04.2024 | ||
GR | 04.04.2024 | ||
IS | 03.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 03.01.2024 | |
LT | 03.01.2024 | ||
NL | 03.01.2024 | ||
NO | 03.04.2024 | ||
IS | 03.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | ES | 03.01.2024 | |
NL | 03.01.2024 | ||
IS | 03.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/31] | ES | 03.01.2024 | |
NL | 03.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | ES | 03.01.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP0599261 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [X] 1,7,12 * figures 1-9; claims 1-11 * [I] 2-6,8-11,13-15; | [A]US2002126301 (BOWERS HARRY [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [XI]US2004096231 (FURNO JOSEPH J [US], et al) [X] 1,7,12 * claims 1-11 * [I] 2-6,8-11,13-15; | [A]KR20050004505 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2005073731 (DEER ANNA Y [US], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [XI]EP1527876 (KOMORI PRINTING MACH [JP]) [X] 1,7,12 * column 7, line 6 - line 31; figures 1-27 * [I] 2-6,8-11,13-15; | [XA]US2010247114 (CORNELL DAVID J [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * paragraphs [0021] , [ 0040] - [0043]; figures 1-7 * [A] 15; | [A]US2011158667 (ISHII HIROSHI [JP]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [XI]US2013222461 (KASZYNSKI MICHAEL E [US]) [X] 1,7,12 * paragraphs [0040] - [0045]; figures 1-5 * [I] 2-6,8-11,13-15 | International search | [A]US5825377 (GOTOH FUMIHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-15; | [A]EP1043164 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [A] 1-15; | [A]EP1389528 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP])[A] 1-15 | by applicant | EP0599261 | US2004096231 | EP1527876 | US2010247114 | US2013222461 |