EP3826417 - TRANSMISSION CONFIGURATION METHOD AND DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.12.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.04.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beijing Xiaomi Mobile Software Co., Ltd. No. 018, Floor 8, Building 6, Yard 33 Middle Xierqi Road Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [2021/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Mingju No.018, Floor 8, Building 6, Yard 33 Middle Xierqi Road Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [2021/21] | Representative(s) | Gevers Patents De Kleetlaan 7A 1831 Diegem / BE | [2024/16] |
Former [2021/21] | Gevers Patents Intellectual Property House Holidaystraat 5 1831 Diegem / BE | Application number, filing date | 18927902.9 | 25.07.2018 | [2021/21] | WO2018CN97101 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020019216 | Date: | 30.01.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3826417 | Date: | 26.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3826417 | Date: | 17.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 30.01.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W74/00, H04L5/00, H04W24/10, // H04W74/08, H04W24/02, H04W48/16 | [2022/11] | CPC: |
H04L5/005 (EP);
H04W24/02 (EP,CN);
H04W56/001 (US);
H04B7/0626 (US);
H04L5/0048 (EP,CN);
H04L5/0051 (US);
H04L5/0053 (CN);
H04L5/0055 (EP);
H04W24/10 (EP,CN);
H04W72/21 (CN);
H04W72/23 (CN);
H04W74/002 (US);
|
Former IPC [2021/21] | H04W74/08, H04W74/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ÜBERTRAGUNGSKONFIGURATIONSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG | [2021/21] | English: | TRANSMISSION CONFIGURATION METHOD AND DEVICE | [2021/21] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE CONFIGURATION DE TRANSMISSION | [2021/21] | Entry into regional phase | 22.02.2021 | Translation filed | 22.02.2021 | National basic fee paid | 22.02.2021 | Search fee paid | 22.02.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.02.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/21] | 09.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.12.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 11.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]WO2018110857 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | International search | [A]CN108092754 (ZTE CORP); | [A]CN108260214 (ZTE CORP); | [A]WO2018131945 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); |