EP3661497 - RECYCLABLE POLYMERS BASED ON RING-FUSED GAMMA-BUTYROLACTONES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.07.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.03.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.05.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COLORADO STATE UNIVERSITY RESEARCH FOUNDATION P.O. Box 483 Fort Collins, CO 80522 / US | For all designated states Chen, Eugene Y. 4731 Crest Road Fort Collins, Colorado 80526 / US | For all designated states Zhu, Jian-Bo 500 W. Prospect Apt. 26-G Fort Collins, Colorado 80526 / US | [2020/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Eugene Y. 4731 Crest Road Fort Collins, Colorado 80526 / US | 02 /
ZHU, Jian-Bo 500 W. Prospect Apt. 26-G Fort Collins, Colorado 80526 / US | [2020/24] | Representative(s) | FRKelly Waterways House Grand Canal Quay Dublin D02 PD39 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/24] | FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Dublin D04 F838 / IE | Application number, filing date | 18928207.2 | 02.08.2018 | [2020/24] | WO2018US45013 | Priority number, date | US201762540672P | 03.08.2017 Original published format: US 201762540672 P | [2020/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020027845 | Date: | 06.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3661497 | Date: | 10.06.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.02.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.02.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/365, A61K47/30, A61K47/34, C08G63/00, C08G63/78, C08G63/82, C08G69/14, C08G69/20, C08G75/26, C08G63/08, // C08J11/12, C08J11/16 | [2021/27] | CPC: |
C08G63/08 (EP);
C08G63/82 (EP);
C08G63/823 (EP);
C08G75/26 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2020/24] | A61K31/365, A61K47/30, A61K47/34, C08G63/00, C08G63/78, C08G63/82 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/24] | Title | German: | WIEDERVERWENDBARE POLYMERE AUF DER BASIS VON RINGKONDENSIERTEN GAMMA-BUTYROLACTONEN | [2020/24] | English: | RECYCLABLE POLYMERS BASED ON RING-FUSED GAMMA-BUTYROLACTONES | [2020/24] | French: | POLYMÈRES RECYCLABLES SUR LA BASE DE GAMMA-BUTYROLACTONES À CYCLES CONDENSÉS | [2020/24] | Entry into regional phase | 03.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 03.03.2020 | Search fee paid | 03.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/24] | 22.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.07.2024 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2024/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]WO2016164911 (UNIV COLORADO STATE RES FOUND [US]) [Y] 14 * page 7, line 30 - page 8, line 12 *[A] 1-13,15; | [XAY] - HABA OSAMU ET AL, "Ring-opening polymerization of a five-membered lactone trans-fused to a cyclohexane ring", POLYMER JOURNAL, JP, vol. 46, no. 2, doi:10.1038/pj.2013.70, ISSN 0032-3896, (20140201), pages 89 - 93, URL: https://www.nature.com/articles/pj201370.pdf, (20210519), XP055806019 [X] 1-12 * page 90, column left, line 1 - page 92, column right, line 34; figures 1-5; table 1; compound T6L * [A] 13,15 [Y] 14 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/pj.2013.70 | [XA] - HALL H K JR, "Polymerization and ring strain in bridged bicyclic compounds", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, (19580101), vol. 80, doi:10.1021/JA01556A061, ISSN 0002-7863, pages 6412 - 6420, XP002255671 [X] 1-6,8,10,12 * page 6413, column left, line 24 - page 6420, column right, line 5; tables I, II; compounds VI, XI * [A] 7,9,11,13-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja01556a061 | [XA] - CHO HYUN-NAM ET AL, "Polymerization of 2-azabicyclo[2,2,1]heptan-3-one and its copolymerization with 2-pyrrolidone", JOURNAL OF POLYMER SCIENCE : PART A: POLYMER CHEMISTRY, US, vol. 23, no. 3, doi:10.1002/pol.1985.170230304, ISSN 0360-6376, (19850301), pages 623 - 634, URL: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/pol.1985.170230304, (20210526), XP055807353 [X] 1-8,13 * the whole document * [A] 9-12,14,15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/pol.1985.170230304 | [A] - BANNIN TIMOTHY J. ET AL, "Poly(thioester) by Organocatalytic Ring-Opening Polymerization", MACROMOLECULES, Washington DC United States, vol. 48, no. 16, doi:10.1021/acs.macromol.5b01463, ISSN 0024-9297, (20150825), pages 5481 - 5486, URL: https://pubs.acs.org/doi/pdf/10.1021/acs.macromol.5b01463, (20210525), XP055807242 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/acs.macromol.5b01463 | International search | [A]US2007043188 (SCHAUBROECK DAVID [BE], et al) [A] 1-12, 15, 18-20 * entire document *; | [A]US2007185343 (VERPOORT FRANCIS WALTER C [BE], et al) [A] 1-12, 15, 18-20 * entire document *; | [A]US2009118519 (HIRATA NORIHIKO [JP], et al) [A] 1-12, 15, 18-20 * entire document *; | [A] - ZHU et al., "A synthetic polymer system with repeatable chemical recyclability", Science, vol. 360, (20180427), URL: http://science.sciencemag.org/content/360/6387/398/tab-pdt, (20180906), XP055681423 [A] 1-12, 15, 18-20 * entire document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.aar5498 |