Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Legal status: EP3756077

Designated contracting statesAL 
AT 
BE 
BG 
CH 
CY 
CZ 
DE 
DK 
EE 
ES 
FI 
FR 
GB 
GR 
HR 
HU 
IE 
IS 
IT 
LI 
LT 
LU 
LV 
MC 
MK 
MT 
NL 
NO 
PL 
PT 
RO 
RS 
SE 
SI 
SK 
SM 
TR 
Examination procedure27.08.2024Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2025/01]
Entry into regional phase20.09.2020National basic fee paid 
20.09.2020Search fee paid 
20.09.2020Designation fee(s) paid 
20.09.2020Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.09.2020Renewal fee patent year 03
20.07.2021Renewal fee patent year 04
21.07.2022Renewal fee patent year 05
20.07.2023Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.202407   M06   Not yet paid
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:30.12.2020 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20200920
 
Event date:30.12.2020 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
 
Event date:30.12.2020 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT
Validation States:BA ME
 
Event date:27.11.2020 
Event description:PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012
 
Event date:27.11.2020 
Event description:INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT
Free Format Text:STATUS: REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION WAS MADE
 
Event date:08.02.2020 
Event description:INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT
Free Format Text:STATUS: THE INTERNATIONAL PUBLICATION HAS BEEN MADE
 
Event date:22.09.2021 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:G06F 3/048 20130101AFI20210817BHEP
 
Event date:22.09.2021 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:G06F 21/31 20130101ALI20210817BHEP
 
Event date:22.09.2021 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:G06F 21/83 20130101ALI20210817BHEP
 
Event date:22.09.2021 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:G06F 3/0489 20130101ALI20210817BHEP
 
Event date:22.09.2021 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:G06F 3/023 20060101ALI20210817BHEP
 
Event date:22.09.2021 
Event description:SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT DRAWN UP AND DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20210823
 
Event date:03.11.2021 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (DELETED)
 
Event date:03.11.2021 
Event description:REQUEST FOR VALIDATION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (DELETED)
 
Event date:03.04.2024 
Event description:DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR1
 
Event date:03.04.2024 
Event description:INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT
Free Format Text:STATUS: GRANT OF PATENT IS INTENDED
 
Event date:10.04.2024 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:G06F 3/048 20130101AFI20240305BHEP
 
Event date:10.04.2024 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:G06F 21/31 20130101ALI20240305BHEP
 
Event date:10.04.2024 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:G06F 21/83 20130101ALI20240305BHEP
 
Event date:10.04.2024 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:G06F 3/0489 20130101ALI20240305BHEP
 
Event date:10.04.2024 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:G06F 3/023 20060101ALI20240305BHEP
 
Event date:10.04.2024 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:G06F 9/445 20180101ALI20240305BHEP
 
Event date:10.04.2024 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:G06F 9/451 20180101ALI20240305BHEP
 
Event date:10.04.2024 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:G06F 40/274 20200101ALI20240305BHEP
 
Event date:01.05.2024 
Event description:INTENTION TO GRANT ANNOUNCED
Effective DATE:20240404
 
Event date:29.11.2024 
Event description:INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT
Free Format Text:STATUS: THE APPLICATION IS DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN
 
Event date:01.01.2025 
Event description:APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN
Effective DATE:20240806