Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
23.09.2022 | Withdrawal of application | published on 26.10.2022 [2022/43] |
21.09.2022 | Change - representative | |
06.09.2022 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
26.02.2022 | Supplementary search report | published on 30.03.2022 [2022/13] |
25.02.2022 | Change - classification | published on 30.03.2022 [2022/13] |
25.02.2022 | Change - classification | published on 30.03.2022 [2022/13] |
01.10.2021 | Change: Validation states | published on 03.11.2021 [2021/44] |
01.10.2021 | Change - extension states | published on 03.11.2021 [2021/44] |
04.08.2021 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
07.05.2021 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 09.06.2021 [2021/23] |
07.05.2021 | Request for examination filed | published on 09.06.2021 [2021/23] |
12.04.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
23.03.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
02.03.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
26.02.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
25.02.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
24.02.2021 | Change - representative | |
24.02.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
24.02.2021 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
08.02.2020 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
08.02.2020 | New entry: applicant or inventor |