EP3832949 - METHOD FOR SECURING A DATA COMMUNICATION NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 23.09.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.05.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2022 | Withdrawal of application | published on 26.10.2022 [2022/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nouvenn Corporation 919 North Market Street, Suite 950 Wilmington, New Castle County, DE 19801 / US | For all designated states Francisco, Mathieu Alameda dos Jasmins 35 Mossungue 81210-090 Curitiba / BR | [2021/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATHIEU, Francisco Alameda dos Jasmins, 35, Mossungue 81210-090 Curitiba / BR | [2021/23] | Representative(s) | K&L Gates LLP Friedrichstraße 110 A 10117 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/23] | Díaz de Bustamante y Terminel, Isidro Arcade & Asociados C/ Isabel Colbrand, 6-5th floor 28050 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 18928574.5 | 29.07.2018 | [2021/23] | WO2018BR50263 | Filing language | PT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020024021 | Date: | 06.02.2020 | Language: | PT | [2020/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3832949 | Date: | 09.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | BR | 06.02.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/14, H04L9/08, H04L9/32 | [2022/13] | CPC: |
H04L9/0844 (EP);
H04L9/14 (EP,KR);
H04L63/045 (EP,US);
H04L63/061 (US);
H04L63/0869 (EP,US);
H04L9/0841 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2021/23] | H04L9/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/23] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR SICHERUNG EINES DATENKOMMUNIKATIONSNETZES | [2021/23] | English: | METHOD FOR SECURING A DATA COMMUNICATION NETWORK | [2021/23] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE SÉCURITÉ POUR RÉSEAU DE COMMUNICATION DE DONNÉES | [2021/23] | Entry into regional phase | 23.02.2021 | Translation filed | 23.02.2021 | National basic fee paid | 23.02.2021 | Search fee paid | 23.02.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.02.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/23] | 21.09.2022 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2022/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2022 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - ABDELNASIR ALSHAMSI ET AL, "A Technical Comparison of IPSec and SSL", IACR, INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR CRYPTOLOGIC RESEARCH, (20041117), vol. 20041117:100733, pages 1 - 10, XP061001001 [A] 1-6 * abstract * * Sections 3 and 4 * | [A] - Biri Andreas, "Network Security Summary", (20180124), URL: https://n.ethz.ch/~abiri/download/Zusammenfassungen/Master/NetworkSecurity_Summary.pdf, (20220216), XP055892602 [A] 1-6 * page 1 - page 2 * | [A] - Terima Kasih, "NETWORK LAYER: IP SECURITY", School of Electrical Engineering, Telkom University, (20170503), URL: https://ridhanegara.staff.telkomuniversity.ac.id/files/2017/05/CLO-3.2.-NetworkLayerSecurity-1.pdf, (20220216), XP055892619 [A] 1-6 * page 2 - page 25 * | International search | [A]US7178025 (SCHEIDT EDWARD M [US], et al) [A] 1 e 2* Todo o documento *; | [X]US7730309 (ZIMMERMANN PHILIP R [US]) [X] 1 e 2 * Resumo, linha 61 da coluna 2 até linha 2 da coluna 3, linha 61 da coluna 9 até a linha 26 da coluna 14, e Figura 4 *; | [A]US8392699 (JONES JAMES C [US], et al) [A] 1 e 2 * Todo o documento *; | [X]EP1577736 (MICROSOFT TECHNOLOGY LICENSING LLC [US]) [X] 1 e 2 * Parágrafos [0027], [0032], [0047-0052], [0067-0077], Figuras 1 e 4, Reivindicações 1, 3, 5 e 6 *; | [X] - E. S. I. HARBA, "Secure Data Encryption Through a Combination of AES, RSA and HMAC", Engineering Technology & Applied Science Research, vol. 7, no. 4, (20070800), pages 1781 - 1785, URL: https://etasr.com/index.php/ETASR/article/view/1272, XP055683577 [X] 1 e 2 | by applicant | US6185681 | US2002042875 | US2002112167 | US2004025018 | US6751729 | US6839759 | US2005033988 | US6885660 | US2006064750 | US7152160 | US7188180 | US7266842 | US7360083 | US7478427 | US7506368 | CN101710380 | CN101819618 | US8239531 | US2013298182 | US8705513 | CN104200176 |