EP3831226 - INFORMATION PROCESSING TERMINAL, INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD, INFORMATION PROCESSING SYSTEM, AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.03.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.05.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Japan Tobacco Inc. 1-1, Toranomon 4-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-6927 / JP | [2021/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAMAGUCHI, Hideshi c/o Monogoto, Inc., 526, 1410 NW Kearney Street Portland, Oregon 97209 / US | [2021/23] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2021/23] | Application number, filing date | 18928608.1 | 31.07.2018 | [2021/23] | WO2018JP28528 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020026319 | Date: | 06.02.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3831226 | Date: | 09.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.02.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G09B23/28, A24F47/00, A24F13/02, A24F40/00 | [2022/13] | CPC: |
A24F40/53 (EP);
A24F40/50 (KR);
A24F40/51 (KR);
A24F40/60 (EP,KR);
A24F40/65 (EP,KR);
G09B23/28 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2021/23] | A24F47/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/23] | Title | German: | INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSENDGERÄT, INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN, INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSSYSTEM UND PROGRAMM | [2021/23] | English: | INFORMATION PROCESSING TERMINAL, INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD, INFORMATION PROCESSING SYSTEM, AND PROGRAM | [2021/23] | French: | TERMINAL DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS, PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS, SYSTÈME, ET PROGRAMME DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS | [2021/23] | Entry into regional phase | 15.02.2021 | Translation filed | 15.02.2021 | National basic fee paid | 15.02.2021 | Search fee paid | 15.02.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.02.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/23] | 25.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.09.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2024 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1569530 (BRITISH AMERICAN TOBACCO CO [GB]) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0013] * * claims 1-37 *; | [XI]US2013284192 (PELEG EYAL [IL], et al) [X] 1-5,10,11 * claims 1-20 * * figures 1-15 * * paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0059] * * paragraph [0071] * [I] 6-9; | [A]JP2015507477 (PHILIP MORRIS INC) [A] 1-11 * figures 1-6 * * claims 1-15 * * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0034] *; | [A]US2017042251 (YAMADA MANABU [JP], et al) [A] 1-11 * claims 1-12 * * figures 1-15 * * paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0088] * * paragraph [0089] * * paragraph [0090] * * paragraph [0091] *; | [A]WO2018036945 (MEDITUNER AB [SE]) [A] 1-11 * page 4, line 25 - page 6, line 7 * * figures 1-4 ** claims 1-13 *; | [A] - WOLFGANG E.S. KAMIN ET AL, "The Inhalation Manager: A New Computer-Based Device to Assess Inhalation Technique and Drug Delivery to the Patient", JOURNAL OF AEROSOL MEDICINE, (20030301), vol. 16, no. 1, doi:10.1089/089426803764928329, ISSN 0894-2684, pages 21 - 29, XP055421425 [A] 1-11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1089/089426803764928329 | International search | [A]JP2006507499 (BRITISH AMERICAN TOBACCO (INVESTMENTS) LIMITED) [A] 1-11* , paragraphs [0026]-[0044] & WO 2004/047570 A2, page 4, line 30 to page 7, line 5 & US 2006/0099554 A1 & EP 1569530 A2 & CA 2505530 A1 & BR 316698 A & AT 347281 T & NZ 539945 A & KR 10-2005-0084040 A & CN 1719989 A & RU 2005120161 A & ZA 200503939 B & AU 2003285529 A1 & MX PA05005614 A & SI 1569530 T1 *; | [A]US2011036346 (COHEN SCOTT A [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * , paragraphs [0032]-[0054] & CN 107612312 A *; | [A]JP2015507477 (PHILIP MORRIS PRODUCTS S. A.) [A] 1-11 * , paragraphs [0090]-[0105] & WO 2013/098398 A2, page 23, line 23 to page 28, line 17 & US 2014/0345633 A1 & EP 2797447 A2 & CA 2858479 A1 & CN 103997921 A & AU 2012360820 B2 & KR 10-2014-0118985 A & HK 1198241 A1 & MX 2014008085 A & NZ 624139 A & RU 2014131454 A & ES 2635092 T3 & PL 2797447 T3 & BR 112014012734 A2 & PT 2797447 T & ZA 201402705 B *; | [A]JP2016101231 (FIELDS CORP) [A] 1-11 * , paragraphs [0077], [0081] (Family: none) *; | [A]WO2018036945 (MEDITUNER AB [SE]) [A] 1-11 * , page 7, lines 1-18 & GB 2553281 A * | by applicant | JP2017512459 |