EP3837602 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR EFFICIENT EXECUTION AND MONITORING OF MACHINE-TO-MACHINE DEVICE MANAGEMENT TASKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.01.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.05.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.05.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.01.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.02.2024 [2024/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2021/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARUMUGAM, Senthamiz Selvi No 7, Nallana Mudali Street, Royapettah Chennai 600014 / IN | 02 /
PADALA, Chakri Sycon Maitri 52, Chikkabanahalli Main Rd, Seegehalli Bangalore 560067 / IN | 03 /
MOHALIK, Swarup Kumar RGB-612, Purva Riviera, Hal Airport, Whitefield Road, Marathahalli Bangalore 560037 / IN | [2021/25] | Representative(s) | Ericsson Patent Development Torshamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [2021/25] | Application number, filing date | 18930182.3 | 14.08.2018 | [2021/25] | WO2018IN50528 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020035870 | Date: | 20.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3837602 | Date: | 23.06.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.02.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | IN | 20.02.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/44, H04W4/00, G06F9/445, G06F9/448, H04W4/50, H04W4/70 | [2022/15] | CPC: |
H04W4/70 (EP);
G06F9/5005 (US);
G06F9/44505 (EP);
G06F9/4498 (EP);
G06F9/542 (US);
H04L67/125 (US);
H04W4/50 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/25] | G06F9/44, H04W4/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/25] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR EFFIZIENTEN AUSFÜHRUNG UND ÜBERWACHUNG VON VERWALTUNGSAUFGABEN EINER MASCHINE-ZU-MASCHINE-VORRICHTUNG | [2021/25] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR EFFICIENT EXECUTION AND MONITORING OF MACHINE-TO-MACHINE DEVICE MANAGEMENT TASKS | [2021/25] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ D'EXÉCUTION ET DE SURVEILLANCE EFFICACES DE TÂCHES DE GESTION DE DISPOSITIF MACHINE À MACHINE | [2021/25] | Entry into regional phase | 18.02.2021 | National basic fee paid | 18.02.2021 | Search fee paid | 18.02.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.02.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/25] | 06.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.05.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.09.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/07] | 12.10.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2024/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2023 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2017228253 (LAYMAN ANDREW [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * abstract * * paragraphs [0005] , [0045] , [0123] ** paragraph [0142] - paragraph [0146] *; | [I] - Steinheimer Michael, "Autonomous decentralized M2M Application Service Provision", (20171231), URL: https://pearl.plymouth.ac.uk/bitstream/handle/10026.1/11957/2018steinheimer10398125phd_full.pdf?sequence=4&isAllowed=y, (20220216), XP055892560 [I] 1-16 * Abstract, second paragraph * * pages 230,360 * * pages 354,231; figures 7.4,5.38 * * page 241 - page 245 * * pages 232,361 * * page 188; figure 5.19 * * page 187; figure 5.17 * * pages 173,179; figures 5.10,5.14 * | [A] - LORENCIK D ET AL, "Cloud robotics: Current trends and possible use as a service", APPLIED MACHINE INTELLIGENCE AND INFORMATICS (SAMI), 2013 IEEE 11TH INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON, IEEE, (20130131), doi:10.1109/SAMI.2013.6480950, ISBN 978-1-4673-5928-3, pages 85 - 88, XP032343519 [A] 1-16 * figure 6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/SAMI.2013.6480950 | International search | [Y]EP1213892 (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) [Y] 1-26 * paragraphs [0049-0050, 0054, 0058-0059] *; | [Y]JP2017142798 (SALESFORCE COM INC) [Y] 1-26 * paragraphs [0009,0010, 0013, 0014, 0023, 0035,0155-0157, 0161, 0164, 0199, 0201, 0204, 0207, 0216, 0223, 0224, 0314] *; | [Y]US9836347 (MCCHORD AUSTIN [US], et al) [Y] 6, 7, 15, 16* detailed description paragraphs 20-28 * |