EP3841786 - DUAL CONNECTIVITY HANDOVER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.08.2024 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.06.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.05.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [2024/36] |
Former [2021/26] | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HE, Jing 523-1803, No. 10 Nanhu Nan Road, Chaoyang District Beijing 100102 / CN | 02 /
HENTTONEN, Tero Kivenlahdenkatu 3B22 02320 Espoo / FI | 03 /
ALI, Amaanat Likusterikatu 1B 44 02250 Espoo / FI | 04 /
STANCZAK, Jedrzej Os. Rzeczypospolitej 101/27 61-392 Poznan / PL | [2021/26] | Representative(s) | Script Intellectual Property LLP Suite J, Anchor House School Close Chandlers Ford Eastleigh, Hampshire SO53 4DY / GB | [2024/36] |
Former [2021/26] | Nokia EPO representatives Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | Application number, filing date | 18930735.8 | 21.08.2018 | [2021/26] | WO2018CN101584 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020037503 | Date: | 27.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3841786 | Date: | 30.06.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.02.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3841786 | Date: | 04.09.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 27.02.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W36/00 | [2021/26] | CPC: |
H04W36/0069 (EP,US);
H04W36/0064 (EP,US);
H04W74/0833 (US);
H04W36/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DUALE VERBINDUNGSÜBERGABE | [2021/26] | English: | DUAL CONNECTIVITY HANDOVER | [2021/26] | French: | TRANSFERT À DOUBLE CONNECTIVITÉ | [2021/26] | Entry into regional phase | 22.03.2021 | National basic fee paid | 22.03.2021 | Search fee paid | 22.03.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.03.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/26] | 22.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.06.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 26.07.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.07.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |