EP3841536 - PROACTIVE DEFENSE OF UNTRUSTWORTHY MACHINE LEARNING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.02.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.09.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.05.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VISA INTERNATIONAL SERVICE ASSOCIATION P.O. Box 8999 San Francisco, CA 94128-8999 / US | [2021/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GADDAM, Ajit 800 Sea Spray Lane, Apt. 301 Foster City, California 94404 / US | 02 /
JERMAKYAN, Ara 19012 Plummer Street Northridge, California 91324 / US | 03 /
JOGLEKAR, Pushkar 1333 Powell Street, Unit 332 Emeryville, California 94608 / US | [2021/26] | Representative(s) | EIP Fairfax House 15 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HU / GB | [2021/26] | Application number, filing date | 18931228.3 | 23.08.2018 | [2021/26] | WO2018US47793 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020040776 | Date: | 27.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3841536 | Date: | 30.06.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.02.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3841536 | Date: | 06.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 27.02.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06N99/00, G06F21/55, G06N3/04, G06N5/00, G06N20/10, H04L9/40 | [2023/41] | CPC: |
H04L63/1408 (EP);
G06N3/08 (US);
G06F21/554 (EP,US);
G06N20/10 (EP,US);
H04L63/1441 (EP);
G06F2221/2133 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2021/32] | G06N99/00, G06F21/55, H04L29/06, G06N3/04, G06N5/00, G06N20/10 | ||
Former IPC [2021/26] | G06N99/00, G06F21/55 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PROAKTIVE ABWEHR EINES NICHT VERTRAUENSWÜRDIGEN SYSTEMS FÜR MASCHINELLES LERNEN | [2021/26] | English: | PROACTIVE DEFENSE OF UNTRUSTWORTHY MACHINE LEARNING SYSTEM | [2021/26] | French: | DÉFENSE PROACTIVE D'UN SYSTÈME D'APPRENTISSAGE AUTOMATIQUE INDIGNE DE CONFIANCE | [2021/26] | Entry into regional phase | 23.03.2021 | National basic fee paid | 23.03.2021 | Search fee paid | 23.03.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.03.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/26] | 02.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 29.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 06.03.2024 | ES | 06.03.2024 | FI | 06.03.2024 | HR | 06.03.2024 | LT | 06.03.2024 | LV | 06.03.2024 | NL | 06.03.2024 | SE | 06.03.2024 | NO | 06.06.2024 | RS | 06.06.2024 | GR | 07.06.2024 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/37] | BG | 06.03.2024 | |
ES | 06.03.2024 | ||
FI | 06.03.2024 | ||
HR | 06.03.2024 | ||
LT | 06.03.2024 | ||
LV | 06.03.2024 | ||
SE | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.06.2024 | ||
RS | 06.06.2024 | ||
GR | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/36] | BG | 06.03.2024 | |
ES | 06.03.2024 | ||
FI | 06.03.2024 | ||
HR | 06.03.2024 | ||
LT | 06.03.2024 | ||
LV | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.06.2024 | ||
RS | 06.06.2024 | ||
GR | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | BG | 06.03.2024 | |
ES | 06.03.2024 | ||
FI | 06.03.2024 | ||
HR | 06.03.2024 | ||
LT | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.06.2024 | ||
RS | 06.06.2024 | ||
GR | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 06.03.2024 | |
FI | 06.03.2024 | ||
HR | 06.03.2024 | ||
LT | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.06.2024 | ||
RS | 06.06.2024 | ||
GR | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 06.03.2024 | |
NO | 06.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US9639699 (KURUPATI SREENATH [US]); | International search | [A]US2008184371 (MOSKOVITCH ROBERT [IL], et al); | [A]US2011320816 (YAO DANFENG [US], et al); | [A]US2017235954 (KURUPATI SREENATH [US]); |