EP3841451 - MULTIVIEW DISPLAY, SYSTEM, AND METHOD WITH USER TRACKING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.02.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.05.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LEIA Inc. 2440 Sand Hill Road, Suite 100 Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | [2021/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FATTAL, David A. LEIA INC. 2440 Sand Hill Rd., Ste. 100 Menlo Park, California 94025 / US | [2021/26] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/26] | Brunner, John Michael Owen Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 18932230.8 | 26.08.2018 | [2021/26] | WO2018US48038 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020046259 | Date: | 05.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3841451 | Date: | 30.06.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.03.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 05.03.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/01, G06F3/00, G06F3/14, G06K9/00, G06T19/00, G06K17/00, G02B27/00, G02B30/33 | [2022/14] | CPC: |
G09G3/36 (EP);
G06F3/011 (EP,KR);
H04N13/366 (US);
G02B27/0093 (EP);
G02B30/33 (EP,US);
G02B6/0036 (US);
G02F1/133615 (EP);
G06F3/005 (KR);
G06F3/017 (KR);
G06F3/1423 (KR);
G06T19/006 (EP,KR);
G06V40/20 (KR);
H04N13/307 (EP);
G02B5/1819 (EP);
G02B6/0033 (EP);
G09G2354/00 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/26] | G06F3/01, G06F3/00, G06F3/14, G06K9/00, G06T19/00, G06K17/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/26] | Title | German: | MEHRSICHTSANZEIGE, SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN MIT BENUTZERVERFOLGUNG | [2021/26] | English: | MULTIVIEW DISPLAY, SYSTEM, AND METHOD WITH USER TRACKING | [2021/26] | French: | AFFICHEUR MULTI-VUES, SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ AVEC SUIVI D'UTILISATEUR | [2021/26] | Entry into regional phase | 01.03.2021 | National basic fee paid | 01.03.2021 | Search fee paid | 01.03.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.03.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/26] | 09.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.06.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2015041983 (AMAZON TECH INC [US]) [Y] 9,14* figure 6; claim 1 *; | [XY]WO2017041073 (LEIA INC [US]) [X] 1,4,6-8,10,11,13,15 * figures 4A,4B; claims 1,8 * * claim 6 * * claim 9 * [Y] 2,3,5,9,12,14; | [Y]WO2017132579 (LEIA INC [US]) [Y] 2,3,5,12 * claim 6 * * claim 9 * | International search | [Y]US2010293502 (KANG YUNHWAN [KR], et al) [Y] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0003], [0053], [0114]. *; | [A]US2015077526 (KIM SUNG-YEOL [KR], et al) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0011]-[0034] and claims 1, 17. *; | [A]KR101629479B [A] 1-20* See paragraphs [0026]-[0032] and claims 1, 7 *; | [Y]US2018188441 (FATTAL DAVID A [US]) [Y] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0034], [0047], [0055], [0061], [0085] and claims 1, 6, 10. *; | [Y]US2018196194 (FATTAL DAVID A [US]) [Y] 2-6,13,14,18 * See claims 1, 5-6. * | by applicant | WO2015041983 | WO2017041073 | WO2017132579 |