EP3678384 - RING SCREEN SPEAKER ARRAY AND VIRTUAL SOUND SOURCE FORMATION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.10.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.06.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.02.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Soundking Electroncs & Sound Co., Ltd. No.818 Chengxin Road Yinzhou District Ningbo, Zheijiang 315100 / CN | [2020/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHAO, Qian No.818 Chengxin Road, Yinzhou District Ningbo, Zhejiang 315100 / CN | 02 /
ZHENG, Jianguo No.818 Chengxin Road, Yinzhou District Ningbo, Zhejiang 315100 / CN | [2020/28] | Representative(s) | Ipside 7-9 Allée Haussmann 33300 Bordeaux Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2020/28] | Ipside 7-9 Allées Haussmann 33300 Bordeaux Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 18932557.4 | 30.09.2018 | [2020/28] | WO2018CN109215 | Priority number, date | CN20181128396 | 04.09.2018 Original published format: CN201811028396 | [2020/28] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020047930 | Date: | 12.03.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3678384 | Date: | 08.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 12.03.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04R1/40, H04R1/26, // H04R1/02 | [2021/51] | CPC: |
H04R1/26 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04R1/403 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04R5/02 (US);
H04R1/028 (EP);
H04R2201/401 (EP);
H04R2430/01 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2020/28] | H04R1/40, H04R1/26 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/28] | Title | German: | RINGSCHIRM-LAUTSPRECHERANORDNUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER VIRTUELLEN TONQUELLE | [2020/28] | English: | RING SCREEN SPEAKER ARRAY AND VIRTUAL SOUND SOURCE FORMATION METHOD | [2020/28] | French: | RÉSEAU DE HAUT-PARLEURS À ÉCRAN ANNULAIRE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FORMATION DE SOURCE SONORE VIRTUELLE | [2020/28] | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.2020 | Translation filed | 30.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.2020 | Search fee paid | 30.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/28] | 08.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.02.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed |