EP3851730 - METHOD FOR OPERATING LIQUEFIED NATURAL GAS RECEIVING EQUIPMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.07.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.06.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.08.2022 [2022/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JGC Corporation 3-1, Minatomirai, 2-chome Nishi-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 220-6001 / JP | [2021/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KURATA, Kojiro c/o JGC Corporation, 3-1, Minatomirai 2-chome, Nishi-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 220-6001 / JP | 02 /
TAKAHASHI, Shinji c/o JGC Corporation, 3-1, Minatomirai 2-chome, Nishi-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 220-6001 / JP | 03 /
KAMIYA, Atsushi c/o JGC Corporation, 3-1, Minatomirai 2-chome, Nishi-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 220-6001 / JP | [2021/29] | Representative(s) | Becker, Eberhard Becker Kurig & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Bavariastraße 7 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/29] | Becker, Eberhard Becker & Kurig Partnerschaft Patentanwälte PartmbB Bavariastrasse 7 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18933604.3 | 14.09.2018 | [2021/29] | WO2018JP34255 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020054068 | Date: | 19.03.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3851730 | Date: | 21.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 19.03.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F17C13/00, F17C9/02 | [2021/38] | CPC: |
F17C9/02 (EP,KR);
F17C13/02 (KR);
F17C2221/033 (EP,KR);
F17C2223/0161 (EP);
F17C2223/033 (EP);
F17C2225/0123 (EP);
F17C2225/035 (EP);
F17C2227/0135 (EP);
F17C2227/0157 (EP,KR);
F17C2227/0318 (EP);
F17C2250/03 (EP);
F17C2250/043 (EP);
F17C2265/03 (EP,KR);
F17C2265/037 (EP);
F17C2265/05 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/29] | F17C13/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/29] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB EINER FLÜSSIGERDGASAUFNAHMEANLAGE | [2021/29] | English: | METHOD FOR OPERATING LIQUEFIED NATURAL GAS RECEIVING EQUIPMENT | [2021/29] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN ÉQUIPEMENT DE RÉCEPTION DE GAZ NATUREL LIQUÉFIÉ | [2021/29] | Entry into regional phase | 23.02.2021 | Translation filed | 23.02.2021 | National basic fee paid | 23.02.2021 | Search fee paid | 23.02.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.02.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/29] | 25.03.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/35] | 14.04.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2018112218 (IHI CORP) [A] 1-8 * (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2016177399 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1-8 * (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2010154617 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD, et al) [A] 1-8 * (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2010246306 (NTT FACILITIES INC) [A] 1-8 * (Family: none) * | by applicant | JPS6343372B | JP2018112218 |