blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3855821

EP3855821 - USER EQUIPMENT AND RADIO COMMUNICATION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  14.03.2025
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  25.06.2021
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.03.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip18.03.2025New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NTT DOCOMO, INC.
11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-6150 / JP
[2021/30]
Inventor(s)01 / TAKEDA, Kazuki
c/o Intellectual Property Department
NTT DOCOMO, INC.
SANNO PARK TOWER
11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-6150 / JP
02 / NAGATA, Satoshi
c/o Intellectual Property Department
NTT DOCOMO, INC.
SANNO PARK TOWER
11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-6150 / JP
03 / WANG, Lihui
c/o DOCOMO Beijing Communications
Laboratories Co., Ltd.
7/F, Raycom Infotech Park A
No.2 Kexueyuan South Road, Haidian District
Beijing 100190 / CN
04 / HOU, Xiaolin
c/o DOCOMO Beijing Communications
Laboratories Co., Ltd.
7/F, Raycom Infotech Park A
No.2 Kexueyuan South Road, Haidian District
Beijing 100190 / CN
 [2021/30]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[2021/30]
Application number, filing date18934162.121.09.2018
[2021/30]
WO2018JP35221
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2020059148
Date:26.03.2020
Language:JA
[2020/13]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3855821
Date:28.07.2021
Language:EN
[2021/30]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP26.03.2020
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.04.2022
ClassificationIPC:H04L5/00
[2022/18]
CPC:
H04L5/0091 (EP); H04W72/1268 (US); H04L1/0003 (US);
H04L1/0061 (US); H04L5/0053 (EP); H04W72/0466 (US);
H04W72/23 (EP,US); H04L27/2602 (EP); H04W28/18 (EP) (-)
Former IPC [2021/30]H04W72/04
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2021/30]
TitleGerman:BENUTZERGERÄT UND FUNKKOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN[2021/30]
English:USER EQUIPMENT AND RADIO COMMUNICATION METHOD[2021/30]
French:ÉQUIPEMENT UTILISATEUR, ET PROCÉDÉ DE RADIOCOMMUNICATION[2021/30]
Entry into regional phase07.04.2021Translation filed 
07.04.2021National basic fee paid 
07.04.2021Search fee paid 
07.04.2021Designation fee(s) paid 
07.04.2021Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.04.2021Examination requested  [2021/30]
01.08.2022Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.03.2025Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.04.2021Renewal fee patent year 03
14.09.2021Renewal fee patent year 04
19.09.2022Renewal fee patent year 05
20.09.2023Renewal fee patent year 06
13.09.2024Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XA]EP2737767  (FUJITSU LTD [JP]);
 [XA]EP3076735  (SHARP KK [JP])
International search[Y]JP2011151601  (ALAXALA NETWORKS CORP);
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.